Azari v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helya Azari
Defendant: Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00285
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Joseph D Kern for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #18 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kern, Joseph)
March 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Kern, Joseph)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to 3/13/2019 to answer #15 is granted. Mailed notice (reg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph D Kern for presentment of extension of time #15 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kern, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC for extension of time (UNOPPOSED) (Kern, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC by Joseph D Kern (Kern, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helya Azari as to Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Davidson, Joseph)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by Gregory Tyler Noorigian (Noorigian, Gregory)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by Ryan Matthew Holz (Holz, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by David F Standa (Standa, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 5/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 4/29/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
January 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC (jjr, )
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Helya Azari. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. waiver sent on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Volheim, Nathan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
January 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Helya Azari by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Helya Azari by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Helya Azari by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Helya Azari by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Helya Azari; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15374470. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azari v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavner, Beyers & Mihlar, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D Kern
Represented By: David M Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: David F Standa
Represented By: Gregory Tyler Noorigian
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Holz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helya Azari
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?