Kyles v. Wilkie

Plaintiff: Quincey F. Kyles
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00320
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Kurt N. Lindland for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lindland, Kurt)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Robert Wilkie for extension of time Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Lindland, Kurt)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quincey F. Kyles as to Robert Wilkie served on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019 (Simmons-Gill, Catherine)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quincey F. Kyles (Simmons-Gill, Catherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 4/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quincey F. Kyles as to Robert Wilkie served on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019 (Simmons-Gill, Catherine)
January 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Robert Wilkie (3 different addresses) (jn, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
January 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Quincey F. Kyles by Ryan Odell Estes (Estes, Ryan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Quincey F. Kyles by James Bryan Wood (Wood, James)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Quincey F. Kyles by Catherine Simmons-Gill (Simmons-Gill, Catherine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Simmons-Gill, Catherine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Quincey F. Kyles; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Informal Counseling Report, #2 Exhibit B. Formal Complaint of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit C. Revised Acceptance of Formal Complaint)(Simmons-Gill, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyles v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincey F. Kyles
Represented By: Catherine Simmons-Gill
Represented By: Ryan Odell Estes
Represented By: James Bryan Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?