Herr v. CBOCS West, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael G. Herr
Defendant: CBOCS West, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00346
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for Voluntary Non-Suit #9 is granted. Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive pleading #6 is moot. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, February 1, 2019. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael G. Herr by ROBERT J WELZ (WELZ, ROBERT)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Chris D Rouskey for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/1/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Rouskey, Chris)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael G. Herr to dismiss Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Non-Suit (Rouskey, Chris)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael G. Herr by Chris D Rouskey (Rouskey, Chris)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Unopposed Motion NOTICE of Motion by Katie M Rhoten for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/1/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Rhoten, Katie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant CBOCS West, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Rhoten, Katie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxb, )
January 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CBOCS West, Inc. by Susan E. Bassford Wilson (Bassford Wilson, Susan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CBOCS West, Inc. by Katie M Rhoten (Rhoten, Katie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Rhoten, Katie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Will County Circuit Court, case number (18L1040) filed by CBOCS West, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15387787. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rhoten, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herr v. CBOCS West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBOCS West, Inc.
Represented By: Katie M Rhoten
Represented By: Susan E. Bassford Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Herr
Represented By: ROBERT J WELZ
Represented By: Chris D Rouskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?