Beloteca, Inc. v. Apicore US LLC et al

Plaintiff: Beloteca, Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Institutional LLC and Apicore US LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00360
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on March 12, 2019 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Order Number: 34002. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, kmftranscripts@gmail.com, 312-818-6626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
March 12, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to expedite the determination of jurisdiction #27 is granted. Plaintiff to serve discovery requests today; defendants' responses due by 3/14/19; parties to confer re any objections by 3/18/19; status hearing set for 3/19/19 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss #18 #30 is due by 3/28/19; defendants' reply is due by 4/4/19. Mailed notice (air, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC in support of motion to dismiss #18 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ravishanker Kovi in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #2 Declaration of Nicole Stafford in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford)(Mandell, Steven)
March 11, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC by Aden Martin Allen (Allen, Aden)
March 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by John Aron Carnahan for presentment of motion to expedite #27 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Carnahan, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Beloteca, Inc. to expedite Jurisdictional Determination (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint from Texas Case)(Carnahan, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beloteca, Inc. by John Aron Carnahan (Carnahan, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' motions for leave to file documents under seal #20 and for leave to file excess pages #22 are granted. No appearance on either motion is required. Defendants' motion to dismiss and/or transfer #18 will be heard as noticed. Mailed notice (air, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #2 Declaration of Ravishanker Kovi in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment)(Mandell, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,,, #22 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (REDACTED), #2 Declaration of Ravishanker Kovi in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (REDACTED), #3 Declaration of Nicole Stafford in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford, #8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Nicole Stafford)(Mandell, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion to seal #20 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC to seal (Mandell, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion to dismiss #18 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants Mylan Institutional LLC, Apicore US LLC to dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Mandell, Steven)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC by Nicole Stafford (Stafford, Nicole)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants Apicore US LLC and Mylan Institutional LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint #11 is granted. Response due 3/13/19. The initial status hearing is reset to March 27, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.; initial status report due 3/20/19. Additionally, Attorney Nicole W. Stafford's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Counsel is directed to file her appearance on behalf of defendants. No appearance required on either motion. Mailed notice (air, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC by David S Steuer (Steuer, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beloteca, Inc. by Oluwafemi Lukuman Masha (Masha, Oluwafemi)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15479636. (Stafford, Nicole)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Mandell, Steven)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC by Steven L Baron (Baron, Steven)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC by Steven P. Mandell (Mandell, Steven)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 2/27/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/20/19.Mailed notice (air, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beloteca, Inc. as to Apicore US LLC on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019; Mylan Institutional LLC on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Haynie, Laurie) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 1/28/2019 (bg, ).
January 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Apicore US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC (jjr, )
January 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beloteca, Inc. by Laurie Ann Haynie (Haynie, Laurie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Beloteca, Inc. (Mizerk, Donald) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 1/18/2019 (bg, ).
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Beloteca, Inc. (Mizerk, Donald)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beloteca, Inc. by Donald Joseph Mizerk (Mizerk, Donald)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mizerk, Donald)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Beloteca, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15390424.(Mizerk, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beloteca, Inc. v. Apicore US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional LLC
Represented By: Steven P. Mandell
Represented By: Steven L Baron
Represented By: Aden Martin Allen
Represented By: David S Steuer
Represented By: Nicole Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apicore US LLC
Represented By: Steven P. Mandell
Represented By: Steven L Baron
Represented By: Aden Martin Allen
Represented By: David S Steuer
Represented By: Nicole Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beloteca, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Joseph Mizerk
Represented By: Laurie Ann Haynie
Represented By: Oluwafemi Lukuman Masha
Represented By: John Aron Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?