Allen v. DeVry University, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Allen
Defendant: Adtalem Global Education Inc., Carl Leitelt, DeVry University, Inc. and Cogswell Education, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00512
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendants DeVry University, Inc. and Carl Leitelt (Vlahakis, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to the district court judge's order #35 , status hearing set for 6/11/19 is stricken. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Honorable Judge Mary M. Rowland no longer referred to the case. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #33 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing set for 10/28/2019 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #9 filed on 2/15/2019, defendant Cogswell Education, LLC is dismissed. Cogswell Education, LLC terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Vlahakis, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties agreed motion to defer the initial MIDP response deadline for 30 days pursuant to settlement negotiations #30 is granted. MIDP initial disclosures due 5/27/19. ESI, if any, due 7/8/19. Motion hearing set in front of Judge Coleman for 5/14/19 is stricken. No appearance necessary. Initial status hearing set for 5/14/19 is stricken and reset for 6/11/19 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 31 Joint Certification And Agreed Motion To Defer The Mandatory Initial Discovery Response Deadline NOTICE of Motion by Thomas E. Ahlering for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #30 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/14/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Ahlering, Thomas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendants DeVry University, Inc., Carl Leitelt Joint Certification And Agreed Motion To Defer The Mandatory Initial Discovery Response Deadline (Ahlering, Thomas)
April 16, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to the stipulation of voluntary dismissal #28 , all claims against defendant Adtalem Global Education Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Adtalem Global Education Inc. terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) (Vlahakis, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing set for 5/14/19 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Mary M. Rowland in Room 1342. Per Judge Coleman's order, fact discovery to close on 12/2/19. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Rowland's Standing Order for Initial Status Conference, available on Judge Rowland's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, and to be familiar with Judge Rowland's other standing orders. The parties are also reminded of their obligations and the deadlines under the Mandatory Initial Discovery Project (MIDP). MIDP initial disclosures due 4/25/19. ESI, if any, due 6/4/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 26 Defendants DeVry University, Inc. and Carl Leitelt's ANSWER to Complaint by DeVry University, Inc., Carl Leitelt(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 25 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Mary M. Rowland for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 3/29/2019. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Rowland for discovery supervision and settlement. Magistrate Judge Rowland has authority to set expert dates and to adjust the discovery deadlines. Fact discovery to be completed by 12/2/2019. Status hearing is set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 23 STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by DeVry University, Inc., Carl Leitelt (Ahlering, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Adtalem Global Education Inc.(Waldon, Shayla)
February 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Adtalem Global Education Inc. (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Waldon, Shayla)
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Adtalem Global Education Inc. by Jamel Anthony Greer (Greer, Jamel)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by DeVry University, Inc. (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Ahlering, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants Devry University, Inc. and Carl Leitel's #12 and defendant Adtalem Global Education Inc.'s #15 unopposed motions to file their answer or otherwise plead are granted. Defendants Devry University, Inc. and Carl Leitel must respond by 3/31/2019 and defendant Adtalem Global Education Inc. must respond by 3/25/2019. No appearance necessary on 2/26/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Adtalem Global Education Inc. by Michael Constantine Marsh (Marsh, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Shayla Nicole Waldon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/26/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Waldon, Shayla)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Adtalem Global Education Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (to Respond) [Unopposed] (Waldon, Shayla)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Adtalem Global Education Inc. by Shayla Nicole Waldon (Waldon, Shayla)
February 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas E. Ahlering for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/26/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Ahlering, Thomas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants DeVry University, Inc., Carl Leitelt for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Ahlering, Thomas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry University, Inc., Carl Leitelt by Thomas E. Ahlering (Ahlering, Thomas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DeVry University, Inc., Carl Leitelt by Brian M Stolzenbach (Stolzenbach, Brian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cheryl Allen as to Cogswell Education, LLC (Vlahakis, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Allen as to Carl Leitelt on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Vlahakis, James)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Allen as to DeVry University, Inc. on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Vlahakis, James)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Allen as to Cogswell Education, LLC on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Vlahakis, James)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Allen as to Adtalem Global Education Inc. on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Vlahakis, James)
February 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Carl Leitelt. (kb, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. Status hearing set for 3/29/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cheryl Allen by James C. Vlahakis (Vlahakis, James)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cheryl Allen; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15414072. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vlahakis, James)
January 25, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Adtalem Global Education Inc., Cogswell Education, LLC, DeVry University, Inc. (rc, )
January 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. DeVry University, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adtalem Global Education Inc.
Represented By: Michael Constantine Marsh
Represented By: Shayla Nicole Waldon
Represented By: Jamel Anthony Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Leitelt
Represented By: Brian M Stolzenbach
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry University, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Stolzenbach
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogswell Education, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Allen
Represented By: James C. Vlahakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?