Piccioli v. Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A.
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PICCIOLI
Defendant: Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. and Joseph Ohm
Case Number: 1:2019cv00586
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance by Plaintiff Joseph Piccioli. (Neely, David) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office). (smm, ).
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED complaint by Joseph Piccioli against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Neely, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss #9 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 3/14. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 4/4/19. If defendant responds to the complaint by motion, the motion should be noticed for presentment. If the defendant answers the Third Amended Complaint the Court will set a new status hearing. Mailed notice (cn).
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS Report by Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. (Piechocinski, Grant)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant's motion to dismiss #9 is reset for presentment on 2/21/19 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance on 2/13/19 is necessary. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/14/19. Mailed notice (is, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. in support of motion to dismiss #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Piechocinski, Grant)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Grant Reece Piechocinski for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 2/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Piechocinski, Grant)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. to dismiss (Piechocinski, Grant)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: A status hearing in this matter is set for 2/21/19 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. by Gregory W. Hose (Hose, Gregory)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. by Grant Reece Piechocinski (Piechocinski, Grant)
January 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Piechocinski, Grant)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. re notice of removal #1 (Piechocinski, Grant)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018CH15646) filed by Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15426856. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Piechocinski, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piccioli v. Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plumbers Welfare Fund Local 130, U.A.
Represented By: Grant Reece Piechocinski
Represented By: Gregory W. Hose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PICCIOLI
Represented By: David E. Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?