Ecke v. Optum Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: JoAnna Ecke
Defendant: Optum Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00721
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by JoAnna Ecke (Cole, Mason)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by JoAnna Ecke. All Defendants. (Cole, Mason)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Optum Systems, Inc. by Alison Blair Crane (Crane, Alison)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Optum Systems, Inc. by Jody Wilner Moran (Moran, Jody)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 4/9/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cole, Mason)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
February 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by JoAnna Ecke; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15445051. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2, #2 Atty Appearance)(Cole, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecke v. Optum Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Blair Crane
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnna Ecke
Represented By: Mason Scott Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?