United States of America v. Godbolt, et al

Plaintiff: United States of America, on behalf of its agency Secretary of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development and United States of America
Defendant: Orva Connie (deceased), Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Orva Connie, Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants and Shirley Godbolt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00766
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPOINTING WILLIAM P. BUTCHER AS SPECIAL REPRESENTATIVEFOR THE ESTATE OF ORVA CONNIE signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/8/2019. Mailed notice(ef, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court and for the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for appointment of special representative #9 is granted. The Court appoints William P. Butcher as special representative for Orva Connie. Enter order. As stated on the record, Mr. Butcher shall provide a copy of this Court's order to Shirley Godbolt. Status hearing set for 4/9/2019 is stricken and reset for 4/30/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff United States of America regarding notice of motion #13 , MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order appointing special representative #9 (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 RE- NOTICE of Motion by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen for presentment of motion for order #9 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 4/9/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff United States of America regarding notice of motion #10 , MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order appointing special representative #9 (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen for presentment of motion for order #9 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order appointing special representative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Shirley Godbolt (pj, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America, on behalf of its agency Secretary of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development by Alexander Brian Potestivo (Potestivo, Alexander)
February 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit as to Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants by United States of America, on behalf of its agency Secretary of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America, on behalf of its agency Secretary of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America, on behalf of its agency Secretary of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America, on behalf of its agency Secretary of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Note, #2 Exhibit B Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C Assignment, #4 Exhibit D Executed Affidavit)(Rasmussen, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Godbolt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orva Connie (deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Orva Connie
Represented By: William P Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Godbolt
Represented By: William P Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, on behalf of its agency Secretary of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Brian Potestivo
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?