Pinto Alves v. Whitaker, et al.
Plaintiff: Director Martha Medina-Maltes, Lee Francis Cissna, Jorge Manuel Pinto Alves and Mirash Dedvukaj
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M NIELSEN, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Martha Medina-Maltes, Matthew G Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00774
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing held and continued to 5/9/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (maf)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Lee Francis Cissna, Mirash Dedvukaj, Martha Medina-Maltes, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G Whitaker (Oswald, Craig)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 3/19/2019 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice(maf)
February 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Manuel Pinto Alves by Andrew V. Sidea (Sidea, Andrew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sidea, Andrew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for de novo review of denial of naturalization filed by Jorge Manuel Pinto Alves; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15457121. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Naturalization Denial Letter, #2 Exhibit N336 receipt notice, #3 Exhibit N336 interview attendance letter, #4 Exhibit N336 denial letter affirming denial of naturalization)(Sidea, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinto Alves v. Whitaker, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Medina-Maltes
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G Whitaker
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Director Martha Medina-Maltes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Manuel Pinto Alves
Represented By: Andrew V. Sidea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirash Dedvukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?