United States of America v. Thomas (deceased) et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Defendant: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc., assignee from HSBC, Georgia Thomas (deceased), Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Georgia Thomas, Juanita M. Thomas, Barbara J. Pumphrey, Michael A. Thomas, Kathryn Hall, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Jacqueline Matthews, Midland Funding LLC, Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants, People of the State of Illinois for the use of the Director of the Illinois Department of Employment Security, Mary F. Reynolds, William A. Thomas, Jr., Valeria A. Hill, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. FKA Bank One, N.A., State of Illinois, Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, Inc. (NHS), an Illinois Not-For-Profit Corporation Acting as Agent for the City of Chicago, Illinois, a Municipal Corporation (The City), through its Departm and Illinois Healthcare and Family Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00853
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 10, 2019 Filing 27 Report of Special Representative by Georgia Thomas (deceased) (Butcher, William)
March 19, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Midland Funding LLC on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to United States of America on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Juanita M. Thomas on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to State of Illinois on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Mary F. Reynolds on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. FKA Bank One, N.A. on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Illinois Healthcare and Family Services on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc., assignee from HSBC on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to William A. Thomas, Jr. on 2/23/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Michael A. Thomas on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to People of the State of Illinois for the use of the Director of the Illinois Department of Employment Security on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, Inc. (NHS), an Illinois Not-For-Profit Corporation Acting as Agent for the City of Chicago, Illinois, a Municipal Corporation (The City), through its Departm on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by United States of America (Rasmussen, Ashley)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 3/7/19. Motion for appointment of William P. Butcher as special representative for the Estate of Georgia Thomas #9 is granted. The status hearing set for 5/14/19 is reset to 5/21/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 4, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Jacqueline Matthews. (mc, )
February 28, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Midland Funding LLC. (pj, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff United States of America regarding MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order appointing special representative #9 , notice of motion #10 (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen for presentment of motion for order #9 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order appointing special representative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Death Certificate)(Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 5/14/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
February 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc., assignee from HSBC, Kathryn Hall, Valeria A. Hill, Illinois Healthcare and Family Services, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. FKA Bank One, N.A., Jacqueline Matthews, Midland Funding LLC, Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, Inc. (NHS), an Illinois Not-For-Profit Corporation Acting as Agent for the City of Chicago, Illinois, a Municipal Corporation (The City), through its Departm, People of the State of Illinois for the use of the Director of the Illinois Department of Employment Security, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, Barbara J. Pumphrey, Mary F. Reynolds, State of Illinois, Juanita M. Thomas, Michael A. Thomas, William A. Thomas, Jr., United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jjr, )
February 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT by Alexander Brian Potestivo (Potestivo, Alexander)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Ashley K.Rasmussen as to Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rasmussen, Ashley)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Foreclose Mortgage filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Note, #2 Exhibit B Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C Assignment, #4 Exhibit D Executed Affidavit)(Rasmussen, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thomas (deceased) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc., assignee from HSBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Thomas (deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Georgia Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J. Pumphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of Illinois for the use of the Director of the Illinois Department of Employment Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary F. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeria A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. FKA Bank One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, Inc. (NHS), an Illinois Not-For-Profit Corporation Acting as Agent for the City of Chicago, Illinois, a Municipal Corporation (The City), through its Departm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Healthcare and Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Brian Potestivo
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Alexander Brian Potestivo
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?