Wi-LAN Inc. et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wi-LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc. and Wi-LAN Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC and Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00941
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 2/4/2020. Claims Construction hearing is set for 9/28/2020 at 10:30 AM. The Court will reserve 9/29/2020 for the hearing. Status hearing is set for 8/7/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 3/10/20 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The parties' joint motion for entry of a supplemental protective order for non-party Qualcomm, Inc. (doc. #44 ) is granted. The Court notes that the supplemental order itself does not authorize the filing of any document under seal. The under-seal filing of any discovery material with the Court must comply with Local Rule 26.2 and the law of the Circuit. See Bond v. Utreras, 585 F.3d 1061, 1073 (7th Cir. 2009) (noting that public "has a presumptive right to access discovery materials that are filed with the court"); Baxter Int'l, Inc. v. Abbott Labs., 297 F.3d 544, 545-46 (7th Cir. 2002) (stating that filed discovery documents "that influence or underpin the judicial decision are open to public inspection unless they meet the definition of trade secrets or other categories of bonafide long-term confidentiality.... In civil litigation only trade secrets, information covered by a recognized privilege (such as the attorney-client privilege), and information required by statute to be maintained in confidence (such as the name of a minor victim of sexual assault) is entitled to be kept secret"); Union Oil Co. of Cal. v. Leavell, 220 F.3d 562, 567-68 (7th Cir. 2000) ("Many a litigant would prefer that the subject matter of a case... be kept from the curious (including its business rivals and customers), but the tradition that litigation is open to the public is of very long standing."); Citizens First Nat. Bank of Princeton v. Cincinnati Ins. Co., 178 F.3d 943, 945 (7th Cir. 1999) (warning courts not to allow parties "to seal whatever they want" and urging them to apply "a neutral balancing of the relevant interests" in connection with any good-cause determination presented by a motion to seal). Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. for protective order Joint Motion Seeking Entry of Supplemental Protective Order for Non-Party Qualcomm, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bumgardner, Barry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing set for 3/10/20 is stricken and reset to 2/04/20 at 9:30 a.m. (or after the completion of the status hearing before Judge Coleman). Mailed notice. (jj, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 12/6/2019. The previously entered deadlines proposed in the parties' 26(f) Report #26 are extended 60 days for all upcoming deadlines. Status hearing is set for 2/4/2020 at 9:00 AM. At that time, the Court will set a date for the Claim Construction Hearing. The following are the updated deadlines in this case: Final Infringement, Unenforceability, and Invalidity Contentions (LPR 3.1) : April 7, 2020; Final Non Infringement, Enforceability, and Validity Contentions (LPR 3.2): May 5, 2020, Document Production Accompanying Final Invalidity Contentions (LPR 3.3): May 5, 2020, Exchange of Proposed Claim Terms to be Construed Along with Proposed Constructions (LPR 4.1(a)): May 19, 2020, Meet and Confer Regarding Claim Terms (LPR 4.1(b)): May 26, 2020, Opening Claim Construction Brief (LPR 4.2(a)): June 23, 2020, Joint Appendix (LPR 4.2(b)): June 23, 2020, Responsive Claim Construction Brief (LPR 4.2(c)): July 21, 2020, Reply Claim Construction Brief (LPR 4.2(d)): August 4, 2020, Joint Claim Construction Chart, and Joint Status Report (LPR 4.2(f)): August 18, 2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 3/10/20 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/31/19 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 9/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019. (Mccullough, Tracey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. By agreement of the parties per their Rule 26(f) report (doc. #26 ), and as confirmed at the status conference, the agreed discovery schedule as set forth on pages 3 and 4 of the Rule 26(f) report is entered. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 10/15/19 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 38 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry)
June 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by Anthony James Fuga of Change of Address (Fuga, Anthony)
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on 5/31/19 (doc. #35 ), the case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Fuentes. An initial status report is required and shall be filed on or before 7/03/19. The status report should address the subjects referenced in Magistrate Judge Feuntes' Standing Order for Initial Status Report posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges as applicable to referral cases. The matter is set for an initial status hearing before Magistrate Judge Fuentes on 7/09/19 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1838. Mailed notice. (jj, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: (General Order 19-0019) It appearing that Gabriel A. Fuentes has been appointed as a United States Magistrate Judge for the Northern District of Illinois with a duty station in Chicago, Illinois effective May 31, 2019; and It further appearing that Internal Operating Procedure 17 provides for the creation of an initial calendar for a newly-appointed magistrate judge; therefore It is hereby ordered that the attached list of civil consent cases and civil referrals are hereby reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes; and It is further ordered that, unless otherwise ordered by Magistrate Judge Fuentes, all hearing dates, deadlines, and schedules set by the Magistrate Judges in the attached list of cases are to remain in effect. Case referred to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/31/2019.(sm, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/31/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 5/31/2019. Defendants' agreed motion for entry of agreed protective order #30 is granted. Enter Protective Order. No appearance necessary on 6/4/2019. Status hearing is set for 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC by Anthony James Fuga (Fuga, Anthony)
May 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Robert David Donoghue for presentment of motion for protective order #30 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/4/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Donoghue, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC for protective order Agreed Motion For Entry Of Agreed Protective Order (Donoghue, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC by Jacob W. S. Schneider (Schneider, Jacob)
April 29, 2019 Filing 28 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC (Donoghue, Robert)
April 29, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC(Donoghue, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry)
April 24, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Magistrate Judge telephone status hearing held on 4/24/2019. The parties report they are conferring on an agreed discovery schedule and will report this at the next status before the district judge on 5/31/2019. A further status before this Court will be set after the entry of the discovery schedule.Mailed notice (sxw, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: By agreement, the Magistrate Judge telephone status hearing set on 4/24/2019 at 10;30 a.m. is cancelled and reset to 4/24/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Time change only. To join the telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831, Access code is 5995354, Press #Mailed notice (sxw, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Magistrate Judge telephone status hearing is set on 4/24/2019 at 10:30 a.m. To join the telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831, Access code is 5995354, Press #.Mailed notice (sxw, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 4/15/2019. Defendants' motion for extension of time to file responsive pleadings #17 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 4/29/2019. No further extensions for responsive pleadings will be allowed. No appearance necessary on 4/16/2019. The parties may agree to adjustments of the schedule set by the Local Patent Rules and inform the Court of its agreement at the next status. If not, the Court will set the schedule. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Finnegan for discovery supervision and settlement. Status hearing is set for 5/31/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC by Robert David Donoghue (Donoghue, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Robert David Donoghue for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/16/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Donoghue, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC for extension of time To File a Responsive Pleading (Donoghue, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #9 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 4/15/2019. No appearance necessary on 3/6/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. by John Paul Murphy (Murphy, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. by Barry James Bumgardner (Bumgardner, Barry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. as to Motorola Mobility LLC on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. by Joseph Paul Oldaker (Oldaker, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. as to Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy E. Grochocinski for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/6/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, #1 Consent Motion Filed on Behalf of Defendants (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. by Eric M. Albritton (Albritton, Eric)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. Status hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Patent Registration)(kp, )
February 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC (jjr, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Claims Involving Patents and Trademarks by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. by Timothy E. Grochocinski (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15487267. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '924 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '351 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '320 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '743 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '924 Infringement Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '351 Infringement Chart, #7 Exhibit G - '320 Infringement Chart, #8 Exhibit H - '743 Infringement Chart)(Grochocinski, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wi-LAN Inc. et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Robert David Donoghue
Represented By: Anthony James Fuga
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert David Donoghue
Represented By: Anthony James Fuga
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wi-LAN USA, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Joseph Paul Oldaker
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: John Paul Murphy
Represented By: Barry James Bumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wi-LAN Inc.
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Joseph Paul Oldaker
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: John Paul Murphy
Represented By: Barry James Bumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wi-LAN Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Joseph Paul Oldaker
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: John Paul Murphy
Represented By: Barry James Bumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?