Von Ribbeck v. Negroni
Plaintiff: Manuel Von Ribbeck
Defendant: Christine Negroni
Case Number: 1:2019cv01205
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 3/28/2019. Oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted and shall be filed on or before 4/18/2019. Defendant's motion to dismiss #14 is denied without prejudice. Status hearing set for 4/24/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Parties shall be prepared to set additional case management dates at the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 EXHIBIT by Defendant Christine Negroni regarding notice of removal #1 (Mandell, Steven)
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Christine Negroni in support of motion to dismiss #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mandell, Steven)
March 26, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages #16 is granted, and Defendant shall file the memorandum [16-1] as a separate docket entry. Defendant's motion for relief from answer date #18 is also granted. The Court will set an answer deadline in a future order. The 3/28/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken as to these motions, but the date stands as to Defendant's motion to dismiss and for the initial status conference. Plaintiff should be prepared on 3/28/19 to make an election under the Court's standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Courts homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/28/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Christine Negroni for Relief from Answer Date Under MIDP Standing Order (Mandell, Steven)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #16 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/28/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Christine Negroni for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mandell, Steven)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion to dismiss #14 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/28/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Christine Negroni to dismiss Defendant Christine Negroni's RULE 12(B)(2) AND 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS AND SPECIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO CONN. GEN. STAT. 52-196A (Mandell, Steven)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Manuel Von Ribbeck re Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP #12 (Vuckovich, Adrian)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Report Pursuant to, filed by Plaintiff Manuel Von Ribbeck. (Vuckovich, Adrian)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's agreed motion to extend time to answer #7 is granted, and Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is now due 3/21/19. The 3/5/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 3/28/19 initial status conference and 3/18/19 initial status report deadline stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/5/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 3/28/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 3/18/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/5/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Christine Negroni for extension of time to file answer Defendant Christine Negroni's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Mandell, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 EMAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, )
February 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christine Negroni by Brendan J. Healey (Healey, Brendan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christine Negroni by Steven P. Mandell (Mandell, Steven)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mandell, Steven)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018 L 013765) filed by Christine Negroni Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15494815. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mandell, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Ribbeck v. Negroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Von Ribbeck
Represented By: Adrian M. Vuckovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Negroni
Represented By: Steven P. Mandell
Represented By: Brendan J. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?