MERCIS B.V. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: MERCIS B.V.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", XMB mobile experience store, mascot_shop2018, Freedom_Bird, toys_shop2018, 2019wholesale-store, yoson-camping, boris-garden, Hiltow, factory-wholesale888, highquality4you, YU YU Toy Store, Tianjin Weize Science and Technology Development Co., Ltd., professional seller, adahot, world china, discount store, nb seller, lovely 520baby, k13081309, tonybin, MEIKEE Official Store, cn1510549108, world toys, cn1524145278gvdk, Yw Qia Er Decoration Store, printtshirt, top_tore, chen guangping, Joy Store, Dufu-beauty-store, toys_top1 gift, anime world, Joy Store 1, figure factory, romjame Store, tianjinlianhongkejiyouxiangongsi, vdidit, meiguo1501, Bananana Store, classicstone201412, ivita-china, factorty-wholesale, cn1524616706, top gift, BORUIT Boutique Store, toys gift, Happiness Warehouse, bighouse88, Luckee Store, wewilldo and Shenzhen F & B Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01226
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
April 15, 2019 Filing 39 LETTER from Chen Hsiu Ya. (Exhibits) (jjr, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
April 10, 2019 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/02/19 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Order Number: 34234. Court Reporter Contact Information: Lisa Breiter, lisa_breiter@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 818-6683.

< Redaction Request due 5/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2019. (Breiter, Lisa)
April 9, 2019 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Depeng Bi for defendant store Highquality4you (Bi, Depeng)
April 5, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
April 2, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (Wang, Xuanye)
April 2, 2019 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Xuanye Wang Xuanye Wang (Wang, Xuanye)
April 2, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #24 is entered and continued to 5/2/19 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall supplement its motion, consistent with the Court's comments on the record, by 4/23/19. Status hearing set for 5/2/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Xuanye Wang Xuanye Wang (Wang, Xuanye)
March 29, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
March 29, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Xuanye Wang XUANYE WANG (Wang, Xuanye)
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #21 is granted. Attorney Xuanye Wang is given leave to file an attorney appearance form on behalf of Defendants. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MERCIS B.V. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #24 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by MERCIS B.V. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith)
March 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
March 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15606031. (WANG, XUANYE)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #18 is granted to 4/2/19. Motion hearing date of 3/19/19 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by MERCIS B.V. (sxb, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/19/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. for extension of time (Vogt, Keith)
March 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Dongguan Xile Toys Co., Ltd. and all other Defendants identified in the Complaint. (mc, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/5/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the following documents under seal: (1) Plaintiff's Schedule A attached to the Complaint, which includes a list of the Defendant Domain Names, domain name registration information, and Online Marketplace Accounts; and (2) screenshot printouts showing the active Defendant Internet Stores for the Defendant Domain Names (Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Frank Padberg) #10 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #11 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication 12 is granted. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Motion for presentment of #10 #11 12 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file #10 , motion for leave to file excess pages #11 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. Sealed Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of FRANK PADBERG regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 3 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 3 Part 3, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 5, #6 Exhibit 3 Part 6, #7 Exhibit 3 Part 7, #8 Exhibit 3 Part 8, #9 Exhibit 3 Part 9, #10 Exhibit 3 Part 10, #11 Exhibit 3 Part 11, #12 Exhibit 3 Part 12)(Vogt, Keith)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 12 EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of Frank Padberg, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of FPadberg, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of FPadberg)(Vogt, Keith)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. Schedule A to Complaint (Vogt, Keith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (sxb, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (sxb, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
February 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MERCIS B.V. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MERCIS B.V.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15498246. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCIS B.V. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCIS B.V.
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Represented By: Yi Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Represented By: Depeng Bi
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XMB mobile experience store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mascot_shop2018
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom_Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: toys_shop2018
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2019wholesale-store
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yoson-camping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: boris-garden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiltow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: factory-wholesale888
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: highquality4you
Represented By: Depeng Bi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YU YU Toy Store
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianjin Weize Science and Technology Development Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: professional seller
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adahot
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: world china
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: discount store
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nb seller
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lovely 520baby
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: k13081309
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tonybin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEIKEE Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cn1510549108
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: world toys
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cn1524145278gvdk
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yw Qia Er Decoration Store
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: printtshirt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: top_tore
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chen guangping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dufu-beauty-store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: toys_top1 gift
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anime world
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Store 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: figure factory
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: romjame Store
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tianjinlianhongkejiyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vdidit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: meiguo1501
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bananana Store
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: classicstone201412
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ivita-china
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: factorty-wholesale
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cn1524616706
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: top gift
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORUIT Boutique Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: toys gift
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happiness Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bighouse88
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luckee Store
Represented By: XUANYE WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wewilldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen F & B Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?