Makhsous v. Mastroianni et al
Plaintiff: Xuejun Zoe Makhsous
Defendant: Capital 600 Investments, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC, USIF, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, Regional Center Co-Manager, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, Ying Ding, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, Qiaowai InternationalGroup USA, LLC, Qiaowai International Holding, LLC, Qiaowai Group International Travelagency Holdings, LLC, the Regional Center, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC and 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01230
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 28 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Xuejun Zoe Makhsous regarding complaint, #27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Makhsous, Xuejun)
April 17, 2019 Filing 27 COMPLAINT filed by Xuejun Zoe Makhsous; Filing fee $ 0. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Makhsous, Xuejun)
April 15, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Attorney applications appear pro hac vice #18 and #21 are granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff is given leave to amend the complaint by 4/18/2019. Responses are due by 5/9/2019. Motions to dismiss #7 and #23 are denied without prejudice. Motion to extend time #19 is denied as moot. Status hearing is set for 5/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Discovery is stayed until further order of the Court. Mailed notice (ags, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM motion to dismiss #23 by Qiaowai International Holding, LLC Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Qiaowai International Holding, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Cohen, Fredric)
March 13, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Qiaowai International Holding, LLC to dismiss Defendant Qiaowai International Holding, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Cohen, Fredric)
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Xuejun Zoe Makhsous regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Xuejun Zoe Makhsous for extension of time #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Makhsous, Xuejun)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15576623. (Gottlieb, Jason)
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 20 NOTICE of Motion by Xuejun Zoe Makhsous for presentment of before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Makhsous, Xuejun)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Xuejun Zoe Makhsous for extension of time (Makhsous, Xuejun)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15576407. (Wolfson, Howard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Qiaowai International Holding, LLC by Samuel D Cardick (Cardick, Samuel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Qiaowai International Holding, LLC by Fredric Adam Cohen (Cohen, Fredric)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC by Richard G. Haddad (Haddad, Richard)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 4/23/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Attorney application to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15565190. (Haddad, Richard)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC regarding memorandum in support of motion, #9 , MOTION by Defendants US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, 1568 Broa #7 , notice of motion #8 , declaration #10 Supplemental Certificate of Service (Cooper, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Peter E. Cooper on behalf of 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC regarding memorandum in support of motion, #9 , MOTION by Defendants US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, 1568 Broa #7 , notice of motion #8 , attorney appearance, #6 , declaration #10 (Cooper, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Richard G. Haddad regarding motion to dismiss, #7 in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to R. Haddad Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exs. B-F to R. Haddad Declaration)(Cooper, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC in support of motion to dismiss, #7 (Cooper, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Peter E. Cooper for presentment of motion to dismiss, #7 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Cooper, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC to dismiss (Cooper, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC, Capital 600 Investments, LLC, Nicholas A Mastroianni, II, NYC 1000 Investment, LLC, NYC 2000 Investment, LLC, US Immigration Fund, LLC, US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC by Peter E. Cooper (Cooper, Peter)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Xuejun Zoe Makhsous. (aee, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Xuejun Zoe Makhsous pursuant to Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act and other Causes of Action. (aee, ) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aee, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makhsous v. Mastroianni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital 600 Investments, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration Fund, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration Fund-NY, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USIF
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC 1000 Investment, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Center Co-Manager
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 701 TSQ1000 Funding, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC 2000 Investment, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ying Ding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas A Mastroianni, II
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiaowai InternationalGroup USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiaowai International Holding, LLC
Represented By: Howard S. Wolfson
Represented By: Fredric Adam Cohen
Represented By: Jason Philip Gottlieb
Represented By: Samuel D Cardick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiaowai Group International Travelagency Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Regional Center
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Cooper
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuejun Zoe Makhsous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?