Howe v. Speedway LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Howe
Defendant: Speedway LLC and Marathon Petroleum Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01374
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status Hearing held. The Court adopts the discovery schedule proposed in the parties' Joint Initial Status Report #16 as follows. Fact discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2020; opening expert disclosures and reports are due by 5/29/2020; rebuttal expert disclosures and reports by 8/28/2020; expert depositions shall be completed by 10/30/2020. Status hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS Report by Christopher Howe (Ficzko, Andrew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marathon Petroleum Company, Speedway LLC by TRISTAN LAYLE DUNCAN (DUNCAN, TRISTAN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 3/27/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Attorney application to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15540830. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tristan Duncan (DUNCAN, TRISTAN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Howe by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Howe by Haley Renee Jenkins (Jenkins, Haley)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Howe by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Howe by Andrew C. Ficzko (Ficzko, Andrew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
February 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (jjr, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marathon Petroleum Company, Speedway LLC by Ian Macaulay Hansen (Hansen, Ian)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marathon Petroleum Company, Speedway LLC by Gary M. Miller (Miller, Gary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marathon Petroleum Company, Speedway LLC (Wolfe, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marathon Petroleum Company, Speedway LLC by Matthew C. Wolfe (Wolfe, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wolfe, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2017 CH 11992) filed by Speedway LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15522201. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolfe, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe v. Speedway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Gary M. Miller
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Ian Macaulay Hansen
Represented By: Tristan L Duncan
Represented By: TRISTAN LAYLE DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company
Represented By: Gary M. Miller
Represented By: Matthew C. Wolfe
Represented By: Ian Macaulay Hansen
Represented By: Tristan L Duncan
Represented By: TRISTAN LAYLE DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Howe
Represented By: Stephan Zouras
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Haley Renee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?