Brown et al v. Crete Monee Community Unit School District, No. 201-U et al

Plaintiff: Craig Brown, CHELSEA BROWN, SABRINA BROWN and Sabrina Walls-Brown
Defendant: MICHAEL BUZAN, JOHN E KONECKI, LINNEA J HOFMAN, CITY OF CRETE, RAEANN HALFELDT, CRETE MONEE COMMUNITY UNIT SCHOOL DISTRICT NO 201 U, Crete Police Department and Crete Monee Community Unit School District, No. 201-U
Case Number: 1:2019cv01496
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 5/2/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: IT APPEARING THAT new case number 19cv1496 was assigned in error using an incorrect category (Civil Category 3 instead of the Civil Category 2); IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the assignment of 19cv1496 to Judge Kennelly be vacated; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case 19cv1496 be reassigned by lot to the next available judge using the appropriate category (Civil Category 2). Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/4/2019. (ph, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Frederick, Calvita)
March 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CHELSEA BROWN, SABRINA BROWN, Craig Brown by Calvita J. Frederick (Frederick, Calvita)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Frederick, Calvita)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SABRINA BROWN; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15543227.(Frederick, Calvita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Crete Monee Community Unit School District, No. 201-U et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BUZAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E KONECKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINNEA J HOFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CRETE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAEANN HALFELDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRETE MONEE COMMUNITY UNIT SCHOOL DISTRICT NO 201 U
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Monee Community Unit School District, No. 201-U
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Brown
Represented By: Calvita J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHELSEA BROWN
Represented By: Calvita J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA BROWN
Represented By: Calvita J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Walls-Brown
Represented By: Calvita J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?