Cohan v. PIL II, L.P.

Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: PIL II, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01549
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Joint Motion to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline and continue initial status conference #8 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 6/10/2019. The motion presentment date of 5/7/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Initial Status hearing set for 5/7/2019 is stricken and reset for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. Mailed notice (ef, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PIL II, L.P. by Eric Arthur Berg (Berg, Eric)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 (Joint) NOTICE of Motion by Marshall J. Burt for presentment of Motion to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline #8 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Burt, Marshall)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline (MIDP) (Joint) (Burt, Marshall)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Howard Cohan. PIL II, L.P. waiver sent on 3/11/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Burt, Marshall)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to PIL II, L.P. on 03/11/2019 by Plaintiff Howard Cohan. Waiver of service due by 4/10/2019. (Burt, Marshall)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 5/7/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
March 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15552355.(Burt, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. PIL II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Marshall J. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIL II, L.P.
Represented By: Eric Arthur Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?