Kostic v. Medina et al
Plaintiff: Zoran Kostic
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA and Martha Medina
Case Number: 1:2019cv01611
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 5/2/2019 with attorneys for both sides. Status hearing is continued to 5/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Martha Medina (Oswald, Craig)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 5/2/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Martha Medina (Oswald, Craig)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Martha Medina (Treacy, Elizabeth)
March 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, Martha Medina, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mc, )
March 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zoran Kostic by Kevin Andrew Raica (Raica, Kevin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zoran Kostic; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15561916. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raica, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kostic v. Medina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoran Kostic
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Raica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Medina
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?