Bratcher v. Rabideau
Plaintiff: Terry S. Bratcher
Defendant: Karen Rabideau, Stateville Correctional Center and William Parker
Case Number: 1:2019cv01865
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/7/2019.Plaintiff has submitted a request to voluntarily dismiss this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) #7 . The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all pending motions. Case closed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(lk, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Terry S. Bratcher (pk, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Terry S. Bratcher (pk, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to immediately deduct $18.39 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to (1) send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff; (2) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (3) issue summons for service of the complaint on Defendant Rabideau by the U.S. Marshal; (4) terminate Stateville Correctional Center and William Parker as defendants to this action; (5) revise the docket to reflect Rabideau as the lead defendant; and (6) send Plaintiff a blank USM-285 (Marshals service) form, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must complete and return the USM-285 form for service on Defendant. Failure to return the completed USM-285 form by May 9, 2019, may result in dismissal of the unserved Defendant, as well as dismissal of this case in its entirety. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. The Court appoints the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendant Rabideau. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case proceed to a point where counsel becomes necessary. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/18/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
April 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued, certified copy of order dated 4/18/2019 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendant Karen Rabideau (pk, )
April 18, 2019 MAILED a copy of order dated 4/18/2019 to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff. (pk, )
April 18, 2019 MAILED to Plaintiff a blank USM-285 (Marshals service) form, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of order dated 4/18/2019. (pk, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Terry S. Bratcher for attorney representation (pk, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Terry S. Bratcher for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibit) (pk, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pk, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by Terry S. Bratcher (pk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratcher v. Rabideau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Rabideau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry S. Bratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?