Reyes v. Discover Card Financial Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Martha Y. Reyes
Defendant: Discover Card Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01917
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 THIRD AMENDED complaint by Martha Y. Reyes against Discover Card Financial Services, Inc. (FILED PURSUANT TO FRCP 15(a)(2)) (Smith, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Martha Y. Reyes against Discover Card Financial Services, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Discover Card Financial Services, Inc. by Laura Luisi (Luisi, Laura)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Discover Card Financial Services, Inc. by Tiffany S. Fordyce (Fordyce, Tiffany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to filed second amended complaint #8 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading to the second amended complaint is to be filed by 7/18/2019. Due to the lengthy extension requested there will be no further extensions by the court for responsive pleading. Status hearing set for 5/28/2019 is stricken and reset for 7/19/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Michael T. Smith for presentment of motion to amend/correct #8 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/29/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Smith, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Martha Y. Reyes to amend/correct amended complaint #6 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Extend the Date for the Parties to Serve MIDP Responses (Smith, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Martha Y. Reyes. Discover Card Financial Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Smith, Michael)
April 20, 2019 Filing 6 CORRECTED AMENDED complaint by Martha Y. Reyes against Discover Card Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 5/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 21, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Discover Card Financial Services, Inc. (acm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
March 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Martha Y. Reyes by Michael T. Smith (Smith, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Martha Y. Reyes; Y. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15616338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Discover Card Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Y. Reyes
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Card Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Luisi
Represented By: Tiffany S. Fordyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?