Harrison et al v. Glenwood Academy

Plaintiff: Dawn Harrison and James Harrison
Defendant: Glenwood Academy
Case Number: 1:2019cv01925
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Glenwood Academy. (Murray, Christiane)
June 19, 2019 Filing 25 AGREED Confidentiality Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/19/2019. Mailed notice(lk, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an extension of time for MIDP disclosures #19 is granted to 7/12/2019. Parties' Joint Motion for entry of Agreed Protective Order #21 is granted. Order to follow. Motion hearing set for 6/20/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Harrison, James Harrison. (Levin, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Christiane Elizabeth Murray for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #21 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Murray, Christiane)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Glenwood Academy for Entry of Agreed Protective Order, Joint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Murray, Christiane)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Christiane Elizabeth Murray for presentment of extension of time #19 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Murray, Christiane)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Glenwood Academy for extension of time for MIDP Disclosures, Unopposed (Murray, Christiane)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 5/29/2019. End of Fact Discovery ordered closed by 2/14/2020. End of Fact Discovery Status hearing set for 2/18/2020 at 9:00 AM. Expert witness disclosure shall be 3/13/2020; Deadline for Defendant to depose Plaintiff's expert witness is 4/10/2020; Defendant's expert witness disclosure is 5/8/2020; and Plaintiff shall depose Defendant's expert witness by 6/5/2020. Parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy by 11/8/2019 to inform the Court if they are requesting a referral to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of a settlement conference. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS Report by Dawn Harrison, James Harrison (Perry, Steven)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Glenwood Academy (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hutchinson, Whitney)
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 5/17/2019. Initial Status hearing reset for 5/29/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/23/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Whitney Newton Hutchinson for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hutchinson, Whitney)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Glenwood Academy for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, Unopposed (Hutchinson, Whitney)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glenwood Academy by Christiane Elizabeth Murray (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Murray, Christiane)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glenwood Academy by Whitney Newton Hutchinson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hutchinson, Whitney)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glenwood Academy by Misha Itchhaporia (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Itchhaporia, Misha)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glenwood Academy by Timothy P Scahill (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Scahill, Timothy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glenwood Academy by Steven Blair Borkan (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Borkan, Steven)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 5/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Harrison, Dawn Harrison as to Glenwood Academy on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Levin, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
March 21, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Glenwood Academy. (acm)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dawn Harrison, James Harrison by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dawn Harrison, James Harrison by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd)
March 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dawn Harrison, James Harrison by David B. Levin (Levin, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Harrison, Dawn Harrison; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15617289. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison et al v. Glenwood Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Harrison
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harrison
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenwood Academy
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Misha Itchhaporia
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?