Durant v. Green Advocacy Partners, LLC

Plaintiff: JOHN DURANT
Defendant: GREEN ADVOCACY PARTNERS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01938
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 8/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 7/3/2019 and continuance of status hearing #18 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/13/2019 is reset to 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 6/18/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by James Peter Fieweger for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #18 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Fieweger, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Green Advocacy Partners, LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead and continuance of status hearing (Fieweger, James)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 6/12/2019 #15 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/30/2019 is reset to 6/13/2019 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 5/21/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by James Peter Fieweger for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/21/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Fieweger, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Green Advocacy Partners, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Fieweger, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 5/22/2019 #12 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/16/2019 is reset to 5/30/2019 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/16/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by James Peter Fieweger for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Fieweger, James)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Green Advocacy Partners, LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Fieweger, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Green Advocacy Partners, LLC by Carolyn E Isaac (Isaac, Carolyn)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Green Advocacy Partners, LLC by Luke W. DeMarte (DeMarte, Luke)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Green Advocacy Partners, LLC by James Peter Fieweger (Fieweger, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 5/16/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by John Durant (Vogt, Keith)
March 25, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Green Advocacy Partners, LLC (mc, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, )
March 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JOHN DURANT by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JOHN DURANT by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JOHN DURANT by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by JOHN DURANT; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15618685. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durant v. Green Advocacy Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DURANT
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Represented By: Yi Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN ADVOCACY PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Luke W. DeMarte
Represented By: Carolyn E Isaac
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?