Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.72.222.113

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.72.222.113
Case Number: 1:2019cv01957
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At Plaintiff's request #11 , the status hearing set for 6/4/2019 #10 is stricken and re-set for 8/7/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 30, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for early discovery #7 is granted. Plaintiff may serve a subpoena on the ISP to obtain Defendant's name and address. This order is without prejudice to Defendant or the ISP moving to quash the subpoena on any available ground. Motion hearing set for 4/3/2019 #9 is stricken. The status hearing set for 5/8/2019 #6 is stricken and re-set for 6/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington, DC. (bg, )
March 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15621326. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.72.222.113
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.72.222.113
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?