Rentfrow et al v. Flagstar Bank et al
Plaintiff: Charlene Rentfrow, Daryl Rentfrow and Flagstar Bank, FSB
Defendant: Slawomir Kolakowski, Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems Inc., U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, Justyna D Leszczynska, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Flagstar Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv02048
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Flagstar Bank in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #29 (Smith, Craig)
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Flagstar Bank (Smith, Craig)
July 5, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(DeCelles, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (DeCelles, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #25 (Dolan, Carrie) Modified on 7/3/2019 (gcy, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Dolan, Carrie) Modified on 7/3/2019 (gcy, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Carrie Ann Dolan (Dolan, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 6/13/2019. Any motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before 7/5/2019; response shall be filed on or before 8/2/2019; reply shall be filed on or before 8/16/2019; motion hearing set for 9/10/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Plaintiff's motion to quash #20 is moot and Plaintiff shall refile the corrected petition on or before 6/20/2019. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Slawomir Kolakowski, Justyna D Leszczynska by Carrie Ann Dolan (Dolan, Carrie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS Report by U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (DeCelles, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiffs Charlene Rentfrow, Daryl Rentfrow to quash (Gurvey, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 5/16/2019. Defendant's motion to dismiss #14 is denied without prejudice. Oral motion for leave to file amended complaint is granted and shall be filed on or before 6/6/2019. Status hearing previously set for 6/13/2019, to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Case called for motion hearing on 5/9/2019. Plaintiff failed to appear and failed to notify Chambers of any scheduling conflicts. Motion hearing reset for 5/16/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Plaintiff is ordered to appear or face possible dismissal for want of prosecution. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss #14 , which is noticed for presentment on 5/9/19. Plaintiffs are advised to review the Courts standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Courts homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiffs to make an election as to whether they will amend their complaint or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs shall be prepared to make an election regarding Defendant's motion to dismiss at the 5/9/19 motion hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by David Harold DeCelles for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (DeCelles, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Deed)(DeCelles, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (DeCelles, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time #9 is granted. Any answer shall be filed on or before 5/23/2019. Initial status hearing previously set for 5/9/2019 is reset for 6/13/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Joint status report shall be filed on or before 6/3/2019. Motion hearing set for 4/25/2019, is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Flagstar Bank by Jonathan Daniel Nusgart (Nusgart, Jonathan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Flagstar Bank by Craig C. Smith (Smith, Craig)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Craig C. Smith for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Smith, Craig)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Flagstar Bank for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Smith, Craig)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 5/9/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 4/29/2019, using the model template set forth in this Courts standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer #4 is granted and Defendant, U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development shall file an answer on or before 4/25/2019. Motion hearing set for 4/9/2019, is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by David Harold DeCelles for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (DeCelles, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 (DeCelles, David)
March 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of David Harold DeCelles as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (DeCelles, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeCelles, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from DuPage, case number (2010CH02520) filed by U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing)(DeCelles, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rentfrow et al v. Flagstar Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Rentfrow
Represented By: Matthew Eric Gurvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Rentfrow
Represented By: Matthew Eric Gurvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slawomir Kolakowski
Represented By: Carrie Ann Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: David Harold DeCelles
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justyna D Leszczynska
Represented By: Carrie Ann Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Carrie Ann Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Represented By: Craig C. Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Nusgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?