Perez v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dusica Perez
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02072
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Dusica Perez to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 (Coleman, Eric)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Quicken Loans, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 (Majewski, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. (Majewski, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held. Lead counsel for Defendant participates by telephone. Anticipated motion to dismiss due 5/28/2019; Plaintiffs response is due 6/25/2019; Defendant's reply is due 7/16/2019; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. The Court stays participation in the MIDP while considering the motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report (JOINT INITIAL) by Quicken Loans, Inc. (Majewski, Jennifer)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joseph F. Yenouskas' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Quicken Loans Inc. #11 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Quicken Loans, Inc. (Majewski, Jennifer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15690059. (Yenouskas, Joseph)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. by Anna-Katrina S Christakis (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc. by Jennifer L. Majewski. (Majewski, Jennifer) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 4/8/2019 (jh, ).
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED complaint by Dusica Perez against Quicken Loans, Inc. (Volheim, Nathan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dusica Perez. Quicken Loans, Inc. waiver sent on 3/26/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Volheim, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 5/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
March 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dusica Perez by Eric Donald Coleman (Coleman, Eric)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dusica Perez by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dusica Perez by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dusica Perez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15636600. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F Yenouskas
Represented By: Jennifer Lisa Majewski
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dusica Perez
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?