Crooms et al v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Plaintiff: Latrice Saxon, Darrell Crooms, John Lopez and Stephanie Hill
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co. and Kronos, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02149
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Southwest Airlines Co. in support of motion to dismiss #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Siebert, Melissa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. to dismiss or stay Plaintiffs' amended complaint (Siebert, Melissa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Kronos, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #31 (Strubbe, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant Kronos, Inc. to dismiss or, Alternatively, to Strike Amended Class Action Complaint (Strubbe, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 6/5/2019. Any renewed motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before 6/26/2019; response shall be filed on or before 7/24/2019; reply shall be filed on or before 7/31/2019; motion hearing set for 8/14/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED complaint by Stephanie Hill, John Lopez, Darrell Crooms, Latrice Saxon against Kronos, Inc., Southwest Airlines Co. (Ficzko, Andrew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 5/16/2019. Defendant's motions to dismiss #19 and #22 are denied without prejudice. Oral motion for leave to file amended complaint is granted and shall be filed on or before 5/30/2019. Status hearing set for 6/5/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Oral agreed motion to stay all discovery is granted pending further order of the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Jonathon M. Studer (Studer, Jonathon)
May 7, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss or stay #19 and Defendant's motion to dismiss or strike #22 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether he/she will amend the complaint or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. Defendant's motions to dismiss #19 and #22 are set for hearing on 5/16/2019. Plaintiff shall be prepared to make an election regarding Defendant's motion to dismiss at the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS Report by Darrell Crooms, Stephanie Hill, John Lopez, Latrice Saxon (Ficzko, Andrew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of motion to dismiss #22 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph)
May 3, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Kronos, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #22 (Strubbe, Joseph)
May 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Kronos, Inc. to dismiss or, Alternatively, to Strike (Strubbe, Joseph)
May 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to dismiss #19 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Southwest Airlines Co. in support of motion to dismiss #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siebert, Melissa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. to dismiss or stay in favor of arbitration (Siebert, Melissa)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants' unopposed motions to extend time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint #7 , #13 are granted. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings by 5/3/19. The 4/4/19 and 4/9/19 Notice of Motion dates are stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 5/16/19 initial status conference and 5/6/19 initial status report deadline stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Southwest Airlines Co. (Hines, Erin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 5/16/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 5/6/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kronos, Inc. by Zachary J Watters (Watters, Zachary)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Kronos, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Kronos Incorporated's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Strubbe, Joseph)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kronos, Inc. (Strubbe, Joseph)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kronos, Inc. by Zachary J Watters (Watters, Zachary)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kronos, Inc. by Frederic T. Knape (Knape, Frederic)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kronos, Inc. by Joseph A. Strubbe (Strubbe, Joseph)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/4/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hines, Erin)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal, #1 (Hines, Erin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. by Erin Bolan Hines (Hines, Erin)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hines, Erin)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019CH01610) filed by Southwest Airlines Co. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15643766. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hines, Erin)
March 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crooms et al v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Erin Bolan Hines
Represented By: Jonathon M. Studer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kronos, Inc.
Represented By: Frederic T. Knape
Represented By: Joseph A. Strubbe
Represented By: Zachary J Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrice Saxon
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Crooms
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lopez
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hill
Represented By: Andrew C. Ficzko
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?