Parker v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Christopher L Parker
Defendant: John R Baldwin, IDOC Records Office and Glenn Jackson
Case Number: 1:2019cv02261
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Southern District of Illinois as case 3:19-cv-00530, filed 05/23/2019. (nsf, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois, Benton Division the electronic record. (sxb, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: For the reasons stated below, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), this lawsuit is transferred to the Southern District of Illinois, Benton Division, for imposition of an initial filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall effectuate the transfer forthwith. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/22/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Christopher L Parker of Change of Address (Envelope postmark illegible). (ew, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED 1ST AMENDED Complaint and no copies by Christopher L Parker (lf, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 IMMINENT danger of serious injury by Christopher L Parker. (ew, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher L Parker for temporary restraining order. (ew, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christopher L Parker for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; Exhibit. (ew, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ew, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Christopher L Parker. (ew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC Records Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?