Stumo et al v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Stumo and Nadia Milleron
Defendant: The Boeing Company, Ethiopian Airlines, Ethiopian Airlines Group, Inc., Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise and Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02281
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. See docket 19cv2170 for all further entries. (bg, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court orders all individual related actions, 19 C 2281, 19 C 2322, 19 C 2348, 19 C 2531,19 C 2597, 19 C 2709, 19 C 2770, 19 C 2839, 19 C 2840, 19 C 2841, 19 C 2842, 19 C 2843, 19 C 2844, 19 C 2846, 19 C 2847, 19 C 2848, 19 C 2849, 19 C 2969, and 19 C 2971 to be consolidated under case number 19 C 2170, to be captioned " In re: Ethiopian Airlines Flight ET 302 Crash." This order will be implemented by the Clerk of Court submitting JS-6 forms to the Administrative Office for the individual related actions. This will designate the individual related actions as closed for administrative and statistical purposes. This order will not be considered a dismissal or disposition of these actions on the merits. All future pleadings are to be filed in the consolidated case alone (19 C 2170). No pleadings should be filed in any of the individual related actions which are to be administratively closed. Any additional related cases filed in the future and assigned to Judge Alonso will also be administratively closed and consolidated with this case. Should any party believe at any point in the future that separate proceedings have become necessary for that party's particular claims, the party should make a motion in the consolidated case 19 C 2170 seeking relief. The Clerk is also directed to transfer all attorney appearances in the individual related actions to 19 C 2170. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/22/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Jorge L. Alonso is presiding over 19 CV 2170, Debets v. Boeing Co., The, and the Hon. M. David Weisman as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 19 CV 2170, Debets v. Boeing Co., The, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Alonso shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Weisman shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/9/19. (aee, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Stumo, Nadia Milleron. Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Durkin, Kevin) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (ew, ).
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorneys Frank M. Pitre #9 , Alison E. Cordova #10 , and John P. Thyken's #11 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice are granted. Mailed notice (cn).
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15791138. (THYKEN, JOHN)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15791089. (CORDOVA, ALISON)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15789458. (PITRE, FRANK)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Stumo, Nadia Milleron. The Boeing Company waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Waiver of Service of Summons)(Durkin, Kevin) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office) (ew, ).
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: On plaintiffs' notice #6 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) this case is dismissed without prejudice against defendants Ethiopian Airlines Group, Inc., Ethiopian Airlines (a foreign corporation) and Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise. Mailed notice (cn).
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nadia Milleron, Michael Stumo (Durkin, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Nadia Milleron, Michael Stumo by Tracy A Brammeier (Brammeier, Tracy)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Nadia Milleron, Michael Stumo by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Nadia Milleron, Michael Stumo by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Stumo, Nadia Milleron; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15672577.(Clifford, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Stumo, Nadia Milleron; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15672577.(Clifford, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stumo et al v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethiopian Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethiopian Airlines Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stumo
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: ALISON ELIZABETH CORDOVA
Represented By: FRANK MARIO PITRE
Represented By: JOHN PAUL THYKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Milleron
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Represented By: ALISON ELIZABETH CORDOVA
Represented By: FRANK MARIO PITRE
Represented By: JOHN PAUL THYKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?