Celis v. Walmart Inc.

Plaintiff: Jesus Celis
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02314
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #18 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Alexander, Jolianne)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing on 6/4/19 is stricken and reset to 6/18/19 at 9:30 a.m. to allow the parties time to finalize the settlement agreement. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed in advance of that date, then no appearance is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to stay #13 is granted. All deadlines are stayed pending settlement. Status hearing is set for 6/4/19 at 9:30 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed in advance of that date, then no appearance is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Jolianne Stacey-Leigh Walters for presentment of motion to stay #13 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/8/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Walters, Jolianne)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Jolianne Stacey-Leigh Walters for presentment of (Walters, Jolianne)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Jesus Celis to stay (Walters, Jolianne)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for remand is due 5/3/19. Defendant's response is due 5/17/19. No reply permitted. Discovery is stayed. The court will issue a ruling via cm/ecf. If the motion is denied, the case will be referred to the magistrate judge for discovery supervision and settlement discussions. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Walmart Inc. (Wilder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jesus Celis by Jolianne Stacey-Leigh Walters (Walters, Jolianne)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 4/30/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint /Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Walmart Inc.(Wilder, Michael)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(4). Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/8/2019. (lf, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (lf, )
April 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Walmart Inc. (Wilder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by Michael A. Wilder (Wilder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wilder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court for 23rd Judicial Circuit Illinois, case number (2019L000017) filed by Walmart Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15679404. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Mitko Bogdanov, #3 Exhibit C: Notices to State Court and Adverse Party)(Wilder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celis v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Celis
Represented By: Jolianne S. Alexander
Represented By: Jolianne Stacey-Leigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?