Richardson v. Kharbouch

Plaintiff: Eddie Lee Richardson and Hotwire the Producer
Defendant: Karim Kharbouch, Excuse My French and French Montana
Case Number: 1:2019cv02321
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and motion hearing held. Defendants' attorney appeared and agreed to accept service on behalf of Defendants. As discussed during the hearing, Defendants' motion to set aside default #13 is granted. Defendants' answer due 07/17/2019. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss on 07/17/2019, then the motion shall be noticed for presentment to coincide with the next status hearing date and time. In light of Defendants' appearance in the case, Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #12 is denied. Status hearing set for 07/23/2019 at 10:00 a.m.Emailed notice (slb, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Jeremy Lee Ross on behalf of Excuse My French, Karim Kharbouch regarding MOTION by Defendants Excuse My French, Karim Kharbouch to set aside default #13 (Ross, Jeremy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Excuse My French, Karim Kharbouch to set aside default (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Motion, #2 Affidavit of Jeremy L. Ross, #3 Affidavit of Mansour Bennouna, #4 Affidavit of Karim Kharbouch, #5 Affidavit of Frank Barlett)(Ross, Jeremy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Eddie Lee Richardson for judgment default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hasan, Esq., Tyiase)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Default Judgment NOTICE of Motion by Tyiase Hasan, Esq. for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Hasan, Esq., Tyiase)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Defendants did not appear. Defendants' answer is due today. If Defendants fail to answer the complaint by today's deadline, then Defendants shall be deemed in default. Plaintiff shall file, no later than 06/20/2019, a motion for default judgment in a sum certain, noticed for presentment to coincide with the next status hearing date and time. Status hearing set for 06/26/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall take diligent steps to provide notice of this order to Defendants. Plaintiff also should investigate if the individual Defendant has a music-industry agent who might be able to convey notice of this order. If Defendants do not appear in this case, they are risking the entry of a substantial monetary judgment against them. The Court asked what State records were searched for the entity Excuse My French, and Plaintiff confirmed corporate-records searches of Nevada, New Jersey, and California. Emailed notice (slb, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the status hearing at 8:30 a.m. is reset to 9:45 a.m on the same date, 06/10/2019.Emailed notice (slb, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report by Eddie Lee Richardson (Hasan, Esq., Tyiase)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Lee Richardson as to All Defendants. (Hasan, Esq., Tyiase)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the status hearing of 06/06/2019 is reset to 06/10/2019 at 8:30 AM.Emailed notice (slb, )
April 15, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Excuse My French, Karim Kharbouch. (pj, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (cc, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 06/06/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
April 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants EXCUSE MY FRENCH, Karim Kharbouch (pj, )
April 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hasan, Esq., Tyiase)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eddie Lee Richardson; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15679963. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hasan, Esq., Tyiase)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Kharbouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee Richardson
Represented By: Tyiase Hasan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotwire the Producer
Represented By: Tyiase Hasan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karim Kharbouch
Represented By: Jeremy Lee Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excuse My French
Represented By: Jeremy Lee Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: French Montana
Represented By: Jeremy Lee Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?