E. et al v. Chicago Board of Education School District #299 et al
Plaintiff: O. E. and J. E.
Defendant: Janice K. Jackson, Chicago Board of Education School District #299, The, Chicago Board of Education School District #299, Chicago Board Of Education and Chicago Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2019cv02327
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #14 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. No appearance on 6/21/19 is necessary. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Pribyl, Olga)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 6/21/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Hearing held before Judge Dow as Emergency Judge for Judge Aspen. For the reasons discussed and stated on the record, Plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunctive relief is entered and continued generally. Counsel for the Defendants stated on the record that Defendant agrees to keep Plaintiff J. E. at Andrew Jackson Language Academy as his "then current educational placement" unless and until a hearing officer determines that his "stay put" assignment should be elsewhere. If the hearing officer makes such a ruling, Plaintiff should contact Judge Aspen's Courtroom Deputy to request a new hearing date on the motion (on an emergency basis if necessary) and may file an updated memorandum in support of her motion. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/8/19. (tt, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Olga Frances Pribyl for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #6 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pribyl, Olga)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Pretrial Order on TRO (Pribyl, Olga)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by J. E., O. E. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #6 (Pribyl, Olga)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs J. E., O. E. for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction (Pribyl, Olga)
April 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J. E., O. E. by Elizabeth H. Jordan (Jordan, Elizabeth)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J. E., O. E. by Rachel L. Shapiro (Shapiro, Rachel)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J. E., O. E. by Olga Frances Pribyl (Pribyl, Olga)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pribyl, Olga)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J. E., O. E.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15680551. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Pribyl, Olga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. et al v. Chicago Board of Education School District #299 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Board of Education School District #299, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Board of Education School District #299
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Board Of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. E.
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Jordan
Represented By: Rachel L. Shapiro
Represented By: Olga Frances Pribyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. E.
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Jordan
Represented By: Rachel L. Shapiro
Represented By: Olga Frances Pribyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?