Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv02358
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated(Koziol, Tomasz)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted to 6/28/19. Motion hearing date of 6/20/19 is stricken. Initial status hearing previously set for 6/20/19 is stricken and reset to 7/23/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Tomasz Koziol for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Koziol, Tomasz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Koziol, Tomasz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated by Tomasz Koziol (Koziol, Tomasz)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report Plainitff's Initial Status Report by Coyote Logistics, LLC (Steiner, Joel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC as to Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Steiner, Joel)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 6/20/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
April 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated (pj, )
April 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Paul Anthony Gajewski (Gajewski, Paul)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Joel H. Steiner (Steiner, Joel)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steiner, Joel)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Coyote Logistics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15686186.(Steiner, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Gajewski
Represented By: Joel H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agatanor Trucking, Incorporated
Represented By: Tomasz Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?