Bell v. Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Keith F. Bell, Ph.D.
Defendant: Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC and Joshua Lifrak
Case Number: 1:2019cv02386
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the parties' joint status report #19 , Defendants' motion to dismiss #14 is stricken without prejudice as moot in light of the filing of Plaintiff's amended complaint #18 . Defendants are given until 8/9/2019 to answer or otherwise plead. This case is set for further status hearing on 8/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS Report JOINT by Keith F. Bell, PhD (Urbanczyk, Adam)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Keith F. Bell, PhD against Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Joshua Lifrak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Urbanczyk, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held.Motion hearing held. Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss #14 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff to decide how to proceed by 7/1/2019. Joint status report due 7/2/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Kalpesh K Shah for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Shah, Kalpesh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Joshua Lifrak in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 (Shah, Kalpesh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Joshua Lifrak (Shah, Kalpesh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: At the Defendant's unopposed request and by agreement of the parties, status hearing set for 6/12/2019 is cancelled and reset to 6/13/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: At the request of the parties, the status hearing is reset to 6/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Joshua Lifrak by Trevor J Illes (Illes, Trevor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Joshua Lifrak by Kalpesh K Shah (Shah, Kalpesh)
May 27, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS Report Initial by Keith F. Bell, PhD (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Urbanczyk, Adam)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Keith F. Bell, PhD. Joshua Lifrak waiver sent on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Urbanczyk, Adam)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Keith F. Bell, PhD. Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC waiver sent on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Urbanczyk, Adam)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 5/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 5/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 9, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC, Joshua Lifrak (pj, )
April 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Keith F. Bell, PhD by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Urbanczyk, Adam)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Keith F. Bell, PhD; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15693491. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Urbanczyk, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith F. Bell, Ph.D.
Represented By: Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC
Represented By: Trevor J Illes
Represented By: Kalpesh K Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Lifrak
Represented By: Trevor J Illes
Represented By: Kalpesh K Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?