Paramount Co 2 L L C et al v. Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Plaintiff: Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C and Paramount Co 2 L L C
Defendant: Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv02393
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the joint stipulation of dismissal #60 filed on 6/5/2019, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint with Prejudice (Gulley, Aundrea)
May 28, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Based on a communication from the parties that they have entered an agreement-in-principle that will result in the parties filing a joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice of all claims and counterclaims on or before June 3, 2019 that will moot all pending motions in the action, the Court will defer any action on those motions [25, 27] and will terminate them on the docket once the stipulation is filed. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 58 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/10/2019. (bg, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 57 MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to all counsel of record. (mma, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 56 RECEIVED from Louisiana Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-01132 (mma)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER directing transfer to Northern District of Illinois, In Re: Dealer Management Systems Antitrust Litigation, MDL # 2817. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Transfer Order in MDL No.2817, IN RE: Dealer Management Systems Antitrust Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Illinois upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Action by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re #52 Minute Entry, Setting Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order for Consideration by Reynolds & Reynolds Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Hearing Session)(aty,Metzinger, Walter) Modified on 2/13/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS ORDERED that this matter remain stayed until the JPML rules on the pending motion. It is further ordered that Defendant notify the Court if the JPML takes action on the pending motion. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/4/2019. (crt,Keifer, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Status Update and Supplemental Authority re #47 Order on Motion to Stay by Reynolds & Reynolds Co (aty,Metzinger, Walter) Modified on 2/4/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 50 COPY RECEIVED of Reynolds and Reynolds Co Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order filed with Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation In Re: Dealer Management Systems Antitrust Litigation MDL No. 2817 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Reeves, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Paul J Masinter for Reynolds & Reynolds Co,Paul J Masinter for Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Attorney Mary L Dumestre terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/3/2019. (crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul J. Masinter in place of Mary L. Dumestre with consent by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Metzinger, Walter) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Defendant is to notify the Court if the JPML does not consider this matter at its sitting on 1/29/2019. Defendant is to notify the Court immediately if the JPML declines to transfer this matter. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 12/12/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 46 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C and Paramount Nissan L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re #25 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 12/10/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #44 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply with consent. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply with consent by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,King, William) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (aty,Metzinger, Walter) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Reynolds & Reynolds Co re #41 Motion to Stay. (aty,Metzinger, Walter) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay Pending Final Determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Metzinger, Walter) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (aty,Metzinger, Walter) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ENTRY: re #22 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to #25 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. IT IS ORDERED that all exhibits attached to Defendants' #22 Motion to Seal be UNSEALED on Friday, November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/28/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action with JPML by Reynolds & Reynolds Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action, #2 Exhibit B-Schedule of Actions, #3 Exhibit C-Paramount Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit D-Certificate of Service)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 11/21/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration: Replies due by 12/3/2018; #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Replies due by 12/5/2018. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/19/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 11/19/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Walter Frederick Metzinger for Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Attorney Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/15/2018. (crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Walter F. Metzinger, III in place of Abigayle C. Farris with consent by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 11/14/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C and Paramount Nissan L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/14/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 14, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #31 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Action taken: Document #31 Order erroneously filed in wrong case, #30 Motion reopened. (crt,FinnSld, P) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FILED IN WRONG CASE - ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/14/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 11/14/2018 (FinnSld, P). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #30 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,King, William) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,King, William) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order) See Record Doc. #22 for proposed sealed Exhibits B - H(crt,Keifer, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Seal at this time. Defendants are granted until 11/5/2018 to file an amended motion that clearly articulates a specific and compelling reason why each document or portion thereof needs to remain sealed. This order has no effect on the Motion to Compel Arbitration, which remains pending. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/22/2018. (crt,Keifer, K) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 23 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Memorandum in Support w/ EXHIBIT I filed by Reynolds & Reynolds Co Correcting to add Exhibit I to Motion to Compel Arbitration (page 10) filed this day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I to Motion to Compel Arbitration, omitted from previous filing)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 10/22/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits to Motion to Compel filed herewith by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order granting unopposed Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Exhibit A to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit B to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Exhibit C to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #6 Exhibit D to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #7 Exhibit E to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #8 Exhibit F to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #9 Exhibit G to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #10 Exhibit H to Motion to Compel Arbitration, #11 Notice of Submission, #12 Proposed order granting Motion to Compel Arbitration)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 10/22/2018 to Seal Proposed Exhibits pending Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, to remove additional motion event selected in error, and to indicate Corrected Memorandum in Support w/ Exhibit I filed as document #23 (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of John C Allen for Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/16/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for John C. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3778809) by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, Reynolds & Reynolds Co answer due 10/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/10/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, with consent by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Farris, Abigayle) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Compel Arbitration; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant is granted until 10/19/2018 to re-urge its motion to compel arbitration in light of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/3/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support with consent. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support with consent by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Farris, Abigayle) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Reynolds & Reynolds Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(aty,Farris, Abigayle) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C and Paramount Nissan L L C.(aty,King, William) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support filed by Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,King, William)[Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reynolds & Reynolds Co filed by Paramount Nissan L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 2 L L C.(Attorney William Spencer King added to party Paramount Co 3 L L C(pty:pla), Attorney William Spencer King added to party Paramount Co 3 L L C(pty:cd))(aty,King, William) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reynolds & Reynolds Co identifying Corporate Parent Dealer Computer Services Inc. (aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified to edit docket text on 9/20/2018 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. (aty,Dumestre, Mary) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & Memorandum in Support by Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Sheri Robinson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Agreement Paramount 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service Agreement Paramount 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - Service Agreement Paramount 4, #5 Exhibit 5 - Service Agreement Paramount Nissan, #6 Exhibit 6 - Service of Process)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 9/4/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Petition for Declaratory Judgment and Damages, COUNTERCLAIM against Paramount Co 2 L L C, Paramount Co 3 L L C, Paramount Co 4 L L C, Paramount Nissan L L C by Reynolds & Reynolds Co.(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 9/5/2018 to modify docket text and create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/31/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris, Mary L Dumestre on behalf of Reynolds and Reynolds. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/13/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 30, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 30, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Reynolds and Reynolds answer due 9/6/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Reynolds and Reynolds Co. (aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 8/31/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Adverse Parties re #1 Notice of Removal by Reynolds and Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(aty,Dumestre, Mary) Modified on 8/31/2018 to edit text (Putch, A). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 14 JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2018002998 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3741466) filed by Reynolds and Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Civil cover sheet Civill Cover Sheet)(Attorney Mary L Dumestre added to party Reynolds and Reynolds(pty:dft))(aty,Dumestre, Mary) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 4/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paramount Co 2 L L C et al v. Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Co 3 L L C
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William S King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Nissan L L C
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William S King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Co 4 L L C
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William S King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Co 2 L L C
Represented By: William Spencer King
Represented By: Timothy S Madden
Represented By: Nicole M Babb
Represented By: William S King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds & Reynolds Co
Represented By: Mary L Dumestre
Represented By: Walter Frederick Metzinger, III
Represented By: Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris
Represented By: John C Allen
Represented By: Paul J Masinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?