Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Jorge Octavio Marquez
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Jorge Octavio Marquez
Case Number: 1:2019cv02434
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 8/27/19 at 9:00 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed, the hearing will be stricken. Mailed notice (air, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS Report Parties' Initial Status Report by Coyote Logistics, LLC (Steiner, Joel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The motion for leave to withdraw appearances of Devin M. Lindsay and Jason Orleans as counsel for defendant #16 is granted.Mailed notice (air, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Attorney Devin M. Lindsay and Jason Orleans to withdraw as attorney for Jorge Octavio Marquez. No party information provided (Lindsay, Devin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jorge Octavio Marquez (Lindsay, Devin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jorge Octavio Marquez by Devin Michael Lindsay (Lindsay, Devin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jorge Octavio Marquez by Jason Orleans (Orleans, Jason)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant's motion for an extension of time to 6/20/19 to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. The initial status conference currently scheduled for 5/23 is reset to 7/9/19 at 9:00 a.m. Initial status report due 7/2/19. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Tomasz Koziol for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Koziol, Tomasz)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Jorge Octavio Marquez for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Koziol, Tomasz)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jorge Octavio Marquez by Tomasz Koziol (Koziol, Tomasz)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report Plainitff's Initial Status Report by Coyote Logistics, LLC (Steiner, Joel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case is set for an initial status conference on 5/23/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 5/16/19. Mailed notice (air, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC as to Jorge Octavio Marquez on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Steiner, Joel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jorge Octavio Marquez (mc, )
April 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Paul Anthony Gajewski (Gajewski, Paul)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Joel H. Steiner (Steiner, Joel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steiner, Joel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Coyote Logistics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15700908.(Steiner, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Jorge Octavio Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Gajewski
Represented By: Joel H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Octavio Marquez
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Represented By: Devin Michael Lindsay
Represented By: Tomasz Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?