United States of America v. Pelszynski et al

Plaintiff: United States of America on behalf of its Agency, Rural Housing Service or Successory Agency, United States Department of Agriculture and United States of America
Defendant: Kristina Pelszynski, City of Peru, an Illinois Municipal Corporation, Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants and City of Peru
Case Number: 1:2019cv02449
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/12/2019:Mailed notice(rj, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DEFAULT. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/12/2019:Mailed notice(rj, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 JUDGMENT FOR FORECLOSURE AND SALE. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/12/2019:Mailed notice(rj, ) (Main Document 20 replaced on 6/13/2019) (rj, ).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/12/2019:Mailed notice(rj, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 6/12/2019. Motion to voluntarily dismiss unknown owners and non-record claimants #13 is granted. Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants terminated. Plaintiff's Rule 55 motion for default judgment and for entry of judgment of foreclosure #14 is granted. Motion to appoint The Judicial Sales Corporation as Special Commissioner #15 is granted. Status hearing set for 1/28/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff United States of America regarding notice of motion, #16 , MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to appoint special commissioner #15 , MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to dismiss Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants #13 , MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for default judgment as to Kristina Pelszynski #14 (Goodell, Kimberly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Kimberly Jo Goodell for presentment of motion for default judgment, #14 , motion to appoint special commissioner #15 , motion to dismiss #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Goodell, Kimberly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to appoint special commissioner (Goodell, Kimberly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for default judgment as to Kristina Pelszynski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit as to Military Service, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Amounts Due and Owing, #3 Exhibit C Certificate of Prove-up of Foreclosure Fees and Costs)(Goodell, Kimberly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to dismiss Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants (Goodell, Kimberly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Kimberly Jo Goodell (Goodell, Kimberly)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Potestivo, Alexander)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Kristina Pelszynski on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Potestivo, Alexander)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to City of Peru on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Potestivo, Alexander)
April 30, 2019 2ND ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Kristina Pelszynski.(mc, )
April 26, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Kristina Pelszynski. (mc, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Potestivo, Alexander)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 6/12/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 6/5/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City of Peru, an Illinois Municipal Corporation, Kristina Pelszynski (mc, )
April 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America on behalf of its Agency, Rural Housing Service or Successory Agency, United States Department of Agriculture by Alexander Brian Potestivo (Potestivo, Alexander)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit as to Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants by United States of America on behalf of its Agency, Rural Housing Service or Successory Agency, United States Department of Agriculture (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America on behalf of its Agency, Rural Housing Service or Successory Agency, United States Department of Agriculture by Ashley Kaye Rasmussen (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rasmussen, Ashley)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Foreclose Mortgage filed by United States of America on behalf of its Agency, Rural Housing Service or Successory Agency, United States Department of Agriculture; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Reamortization Agreement, #4 Exhibit D Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E Notice of Acceleration, #6 Exhibit F Declaration of Lindsey M. Keyes)(Rasmussen, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pelszynski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Pelszynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Peru, an Illinois Municipal Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Peru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America on behalf of its Agency, Rural Housing Service or Successory Agency, United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Alexander Brian Potestivo
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kimberly Jo Goodell
Represented By: Alexander Brian Potestivo
Represented By: Ashley Kaye Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?