GS Holistic, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A", szgarden, zwyouth06, unbroken, litianji0, hostorm, Passion_Zone, Winged Victory E - commerce, M69W, dtunion, buyup, lawei68, afuertech, snapoom, padamall, allison shen, Miracle morning, Daily bursts, qianzhan - 6, super rainbow, pretihom_wholesale, hele.h9, Lucky God comes, chinaecig6, Chinese Shenzhen Gaode Trading Company, pods, diarymm, smoktechworld, szecig8, lentil, yunkang668, reubenking, fsvapesupplier115, ecigtop_vape, pretihom_mall, girlecig, wuqianqian520, ecig_brass, vapro, pigeon0627, xiaohuiqing58481, aliceecig, yqc97, kathtousi0, vaporzone_ecigs_idy, great_vape, glassCartridge Store, airmen and Fantastic Seller
Case Number: 1:2019cv02474
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 47 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/2/2019. Mailed notice (tt, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Motion hearing held on 7/2/2019. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default judgment #43 is granted. The $10,000 surety bond posted by Plaintiff, is hereby released to Plaintiff or its counsel, Greer Burns & Crain, Ltd. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/2/2019. Mailed notice (tt, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for default judgment #43 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by GS Holistic, LLC in support of motion for default judgment #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Defendant zwyouth06 is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal #41 filedby plaintiff on 6/7/19. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/20/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GS Holistic, LLC as to a Certain Defendant (Gaudio, Justin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 40 MAILED Trademark report with orders dated 5/15/2019 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Orders dated 5/15/2019)(pk, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/15/19 before the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Order Number: 34749. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 6/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (Fennell, Kathleen)
May 15, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (pk, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 38 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/15/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 5/15/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #33 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal Schedule A to the Complaint #7 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #8 and Exhibit 1 thereto [8-1], Schedule A to the Amended Complaint [8-2], Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Anthony Marino #13 , and the TRO #25 . The Court hereby enters a default against all defendants that have not timely appeared, answered or otherwise pled to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enter a specific default judgment. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/15/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A" on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/15/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by GS Holistic, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
May 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to AFUERTECH and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (jjr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 31 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/1/2019:(rao, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 5/1/2019. Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #26 is granted. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 5/15/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 32 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by GS Holistic, LLC (Document not scanned.) (lw, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #26 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/1/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by GS Holistic, LLC in support of extension of time #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 25 TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/17/2019.(jjr, ) Modified on 5/15/2019 (pk, ).
April 17, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Motion hearing held on 4/17/2019. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 ; Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #9 ; and Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(f)(3) #14 are granted. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Status hearing set for 5/1/2019 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jh, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by GS Holistic, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GS Holistic, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 , motion for miscellaneous relief #14 , motion for temporary restraining order #9 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/17/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by GS Holistic, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #14 (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLCfor Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Anthony Marino Exhibit 3 Parts 1- 2 by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-2 regarding declaration #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 5/15/2019 (pk, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Anthony Marino regarding memorandum in support of motion #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by GS Holistic, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #9 (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED Complaint by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 5/15/2019 (pk, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 5/15/2019 (pk, ).
April 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by GS Holistic, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15708584. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: szgarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zwyouth06
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unbroken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: litianji0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hostorm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passion_Zone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winged Victory E - commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M69W
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dtunion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lawei68
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: afuertech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: snapoom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: padamall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: allison shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle morning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily bursts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qianzhan - 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: super rainbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pretihom_wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hele.h9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky God comes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chinaecig6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinese Shenzhen Gaode Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: diarymm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: smoktechworld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: szecig8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lentil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yunkang668
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reubenking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fsvapesupplier115
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ecigtop_vape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pretihom_mall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: girlecig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wuqianqian520
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ecig_brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vapro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pigeon0627
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xiaohuiqing58481
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aliceecig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yqc97
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kathtousi0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vaporzone_ecigs_idy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: great_vape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: glassCartridge Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: airmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantastic Seller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Martin Francis Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?