Barrett v. Chicago Housing Authority

Plaintiff: Rhonda Barrett
Defendant: Chicago Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv02479
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Barrett. (Lanahan, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rhonda Barrett by John Timothy Lanahan (Lanahan, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Chicago Housing Authority. (Fowler, Erin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Defendant's answer shall be filed 5/17/19. All fact discovery must be noticed in time to be completed by 12/16/19. Any requests to amend the pleadings must be made by 9/10/19. The parties may email susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov for a settlement referral. An agreed proposed protective order may be emailed to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Continued status hearing is set for 9/11/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Chicago Housing Authority(Pokorny, William)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Chicago Housing Authority (Pokorny, William)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #9 is granted. Defendant must respond to the complaint by 5/17/19. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Erin D. Fowler for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/24/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Fowler, Erin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Chicago Housing Authority for extension of time to file answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Fowler, Erin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 5/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rp, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Exhibits C through L for Notice of Removal by Chicago Housing Authority (Pokorny, William)
April 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Housing Authority by William R Pokorny (Pokorny, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Housing Authority by Erin D. Fowler (Fowler, Erin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fowler, Erin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-012864) filed by Chicago Housing Authority Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15709429. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Fowler, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Chicago Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Barrett
Represented By: Martin Morgan Stack
Represented By: John Timothy Lanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Housing Authority
Represented By: Erin D. Fowler
Represented By: William R Pokorny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?