Gil v. Restaurant.com, Inc.

Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Gil
Defendant: Restaurant.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02483
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juan Carlos Gil by Marty Jay Schwartz (Schwartz, Marty)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/3/2019: THIS MATTER CAUSE is before the Court on the Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Motion for Order of Dismissal and having been duly informed of the matter, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(is, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Scott Richard Dinin for presentment of before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Dinin, Scott)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Juan Carlos Gil and Motion for Order of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dinin, Scott)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's motion to extend the time to answer #8 is granted in part. Defendant need not file an answer before the initial status hearing, which is set for June 4, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant shall raise with the Court the issue of the date by which it must answer or otherwise plead at the initial status. Motion hearing noticed for May 16, 2019 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Motion by Defendant for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to complaint (Horowitz, Aaron) Text Modified on 5/10/2019 (las, ).
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Restaurant.com, Inc. by Kenneth Craig Chessick Kenneth Chessick (Chessick, Kenneth)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Restaurant.com, Inc. by Kenneth Craig Chessick Kenneth Chessick (Chessick, Kenneth)(Document is blank) Modified on 5/8/2019 (las, ).
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Restaurant.com, Inc. by Aaron Carl Horowitz Aaron Horowitz (Horowitz, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juan Carlos Gil by Scott Richard Dinin (Dinin, Scott)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
April 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Restaurant.com, Inc. (pj, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dinin, Scott)
April 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Juan Carlos Gil; no. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15709886. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dinin, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gil v. Restaurant.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Gil
Represented By: Scott Richard Dinin
Represented By: Marty Jay Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant.com, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Craig Chessick
Represented By: Aaron Carl Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?