Entertainment One UK Ltd. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: Entertainment One UK Ltd.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Trcay McGRADY Store, Anime Movie 007 Store Store, Pieev without tail Store, fucsuc PrettyPhone Store, octo-toys, Shop1803396 Store, aicsrad sabadell store, peppapiged store, feifei 3c Store, Unlimited happiness toy Store, huiruashop, Shop3022012 Store, HermosaLai's Store, CBAOOO earphone Store, LYTLM Digital Direct Print Store, shop4609049 store, guangzhouyingxuncoltd, shop4545016 store, AntirrSPB Store, Chidrensky& Store, shop2906271 store, Xz Toy Store, Beloved Angel Mother & Children's Store, peppa piging Store, china star party co., ltd, liangshuhua, FJKIDSTOY Store, Lilyfshion, Shop2677O32 Store, Mother baby world Store, hoooola families store, H-tops Store, RXKGSZ fashion520 Store, sugary store, Mlldio Phone Holder Store, momoliky, giao-giao-skr, 3C earphones Store, KidsWorld Schoolbags Store, Antirr SPA Store, JinoBabyDiaper Store, orez2 store, qualityisgod, Shop4227008 Store, lezhou Store, OKAhome Store, cuihaowey4, winsomeribbon, Family portraits, very western store, huangpope, shop4650061 store, Shinning With Love, yzq64, goodseller-88, Good child Toy Store, shop234238333 Store, nkljl3, Ali Girls Shopping, Biao jicu Store, chinese toy store store, duzhur24223, antirrone Store, DaHuan Phone Accessories Store, Shop3008017 Store, funny life toy Store, shop4653007 store, peppapig toy store, SZ-LifeStyle, AntirrSPC Store, zzz54, am i the first store, hi sweety party store, Fan meiya professional Store, vatello, Felicoalice Decoration Store, heavenly gift store, AntirrSPD Store, Sophia factory Store, lucky good friend store, Floridasunshine, Central garden Store, hudiefeifei722, Mille factory Store, laurasoft, Planet Mobile phone accessories Store, fuyao trading company store, fashioncity2018 and Pure Story
Case Number: 1:2019cv02516
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Correction regarding #49 (ek, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 49 ENTERED IN ERROR (ek, ) Modified on 7/1/2019 (ek, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 48 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Closing Order Dated: 6/27/2019)(ek, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 47 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER, Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/27/2019.Mailed notice(ek, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 6/27/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #42 is granted. Pursuant to the Final Judgment Order, the $10,000.00 cash bond posted by eOne, including any interest minus the registry fee, is hereby released to eOne or its counsel, Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the cash bond previously deposited with the Clerk of the Court to eOne or its counsel by check made out to the Greer Burns & Crain IOLTA account. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Final Judgment Order to follow. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to a certain Defendant (Gaudio, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #42 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #42 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 5/27/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake)
May 31, 2019 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/28/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 5/28/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant 3C Earphones Store (rc, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 30 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/14/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 5/14/2019. Plaintiff's ex parte's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #24 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion Hearing time reset to 5/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. as to Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #24 in Courtroom 1219. Mailed notice (is, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #24 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of extension of time #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. Receipt No. 4624223429. (lma, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/30/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) Modified on 5/30/2019 (sxb, ).
April 30, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 4/30/2019. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #11 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(f)(3) #16 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Entertainment One UK Ltd. (Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Entertainment One UK Ltd. (Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #11 , motion for miscellaneous relief #16 , motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #16 (Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-5 regarding declaration #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2, #3 Exhibit 3-3, #4 Exhibit 3-4, #5 Exhibit 3-5)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 5/30/2019 (sxb, ).
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Niall Trainor regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #11 (Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 5/30/2019 (sxb, ).
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 5/30/2019 (sxb, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (sxb, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (sxb, )
April 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Entertainment One UK Ltd.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15714715. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entertainment One UK Ltd. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trcay McGRADY Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anime Movie 007 Store Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pieev without tail Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fucsuc PrettyPhone Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: octo-toys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1803396 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aicsrad sabadell store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: peppapiged store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: feifei 3c Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unlimited happiness toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huiruashop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop3022012 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HermosaLai's Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBAOOO earphone Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYTLM Digital Direct Print Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop4609049 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guangzhouyingxuncoltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop4545016 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AntirrSPB Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chidrensky& Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop2906271 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xz Toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beloved Angel Mother & Children's Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: peppa piging Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: china star party co., ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liangshuhua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FJKIDSTOY Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilyfshion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop2677O32 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother baby world Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hoooola families store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-tops Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RXKGSZ fashion520 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sugary store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mlldio Phone Holder Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: momoliky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: giao-giao-skr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3C earphones Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KidsWorld Schoolbags Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antirr SPA Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JinoBabyDiaper Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: orez2 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qualityisgod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4227008 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lezhou Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKAhome Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cuihaowey4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: winsomeribbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family portraits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: very western store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huangpope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop4650061 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinning With Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yzq64
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goodseller-88
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good child Toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop234238333 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nkljl3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Girls Shopping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biao jicu Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chinese toy store store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: duzhur24223
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: antirrone Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaHuan Phone Accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop3008017 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: funny life toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop4653007 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: peppapig toy store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SZ-LifeStyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AntirrSPC Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zzz54
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: am i the first store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hi sweety party store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fan meiya professional Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vatello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicoalice Decoration Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: heavenly gift store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AntirrSPD Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lucky good friend store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floridasunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central garden Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hudiefeifei722
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mille factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: laurasoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Mobile phone accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fuyao trading company store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashioncity2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entertainment One UK Ltd.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?