General Tools & Instruments, LLC vs Does 1-2092, As Inditified in Exhibit 2

Plaintiff: General Tools & Instruments, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 -2092, The Indonesian Stores (Does 662, 725, 743, 949, 988, 990, 1087, 1088, 1092) and motorfansclub
Case Number: 1:2019cv02519
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by General Tools & Instruments, LLC Does 622 664 725 743 949 988 990 1087 1088 1092 1954 (Nair, Rishi)
June 25, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by General Tools & Instruments, LLC Does 1170, 1177, 1231, 1432, 1835, 2053 (Nair, Rishi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant motorfansclub by Charles Edward McElvenny (McElvenny, Charles)
June 14, 2019 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant motorfansclub by Amy Elizabeth Paluch-Epton (Paluch-Epton, Amy)
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant motorfansclub by Larry Ford Banister, II Def. No. 1644 (Banister, Larry)
June 11, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing called on 6/11/2019. Movant failed to appear. Defendants *wakehe* (Doe No. 622), dearmobil (Doe No. 725), duabelasenti (Doe No. 743), Nunggudilamar (Doe No. 949), revt*stlea (Doe No. 988), robbandiwahyud0 (Doe No. 990), Ultrajaya (Doe No. 1087), umeko_s (Doe No. 1088), and us.go-fastrust's (Doe No. 1092) motion to vacate the Court's preliminary injunction order #32 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
June 10, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by The Indonesian Stores (Does 662, 725, 743, 949, 988, 990, 1087, 1088, 1092) re notice of motion #33 , MOTION by Defendant The Indonesian Stores (Does 662, 725, 743, 949, 988, 990, 1087, 1088, 1092) to vacate preliminary injunction #29 #32 of Withdrawal (Grothouse, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER in a Civil Case by Does 1 -2092. (Exhibits) (jh, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Richard Grothouse for presentment of motion to vacate #32 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/11/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Grothouse, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendant The Indonesian Stores (Does 662, 725, 743, 949, 988, 990, 1087, 1088, 1092) to vacate preliminary injunction #29 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration Sigit Satrio)(Grothouse, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Indonesian Stores (Does 662, 725, 743, 949, 988, 990, 1087, 1088, 1092) by Matthew Richard Grothouse (Grothouse, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Indonesian Stores (Does 662, 725, 743, 949, 988, 990, 1087, 1088, 1092) by Daliah Saper (Saper, Daliah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/22/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status and motion hearing held on 5/22/2019. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Enter Order. Status hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
May 21, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC (Does 1-514) (Keener, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC (Does 616-1150) (Keener, Kevin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Rishi Nair for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #23 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/22/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Nair, Rishi)
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by General Tools & Instruments, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #23 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Keener Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Keener Dec)(Nair, Rishi)
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC for preliminary injunction (Nair, Rishi)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC (Does 515-615; 1151-2092) (Keener, Kevin)
May 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant (Doe 1) 4seasons2012, info@4seasons-trading.com Wan Yee Choo AKA *at_your_service (Doe 616), Blk 585, Woodlands Drive 16 #12-86, Singapore 730585 Singapore bakercwy@outlook.com and all other Defendants identified in the Complaint (Does 1-514; 616-2092) as identified in the Service List Rider attached to this Summons. (ew, )
May 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Does 1 -2092 TigerGruppe - Seller ID A100E1Y1BQWUNLgorik2712@gmail.comand all other Amazon Defendants identified in the Complaint (Does 515-615) as identified in the Service List Rider attached to this Summons(jn, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS ISSUANCE ORDER: Plaintiff, General Tools & Instruments, LLC ("General Tools"), having filed its complaint for Federal Trademark Counterfeiting and Infringement, Unfair Competition and False Designation of Origin, and claims under the Illinois Uniform Deceptive Trade Practices Act, and having moved ex parte for a Temporary Restraining Order and other relief pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 65 (Dkt. #11 ), and the Court having granted the relief, hereby Orders the Clerk of Court to issue summons for all Doe Defendants as further identified by Plaintiff in a service list rider to the summons specifying the name and email address for each Defendant to be served by the issued summons. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/8/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
May 8, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status and motion hearing held on 5/8/2019. Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend temporary restraining order for good cause #18 is granted. Temporary restraining order is extended to 5/22/2019. Status hearing set for 5/22/2019 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
May 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Rishi Nair for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #18 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/8/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Nair, Rishi)
May 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC for temporary restraining order extension (Nair, Rishi)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 Surety BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by General Tools & Instruments, LLC. (nsf, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 EX PARTE TEMPORARY Restraining Order with Asset Freeze and Other Equitable Relief signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/24/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 4/24/2019. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 and ex parte motion for entry of a (1) temporary restraining order to 5/8/2019, (2) asset restraining order, (3) expedited discovery order, and (4) service of process by email #11 are granted. Status hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC Ex 1 to Nair Declaration (12-2) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2/11, #2 Supplement Part 3/11, #3 Supplement Part 4/11, #4 Supplement Part 5/11, #5 Supplement Part 6/11, #6 Supplement Part 7/11, #7 Supplement Part 8/11, #8 Supplement Part 9/11, #9 Supplement Part 10/11, #10 Supplement Part 11/11)(Nair, Rishi)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Rishi Nair for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #11 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/24/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Nair, Rishi)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by General Tools & Instruments, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex 1, #2 Declaration Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 to Attachment 2)(Nair, Rishi)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC for temporary restraining order (Nair, Rishi)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Nair, Rishi)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 EMAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (nsf, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Rishi Nair for presentment of motion to seal document #6 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/24/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Nair, Rishi)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC to seal document sealed document #5 (Nair, Rishi)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC Exhibit 2 (Defendant List) (Nair, Rishi)
April 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff General Tools & Instruments, LLC by Rishi Nair (Nair, Rishi)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Tools & Instruments, LLC Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark (Keener, Kevin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Keener, Kevin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by General Tools & Instruments, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15714777. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3)(Keener, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Tools & Instruments, LLC vs Does 1-2092, As Inditified in Exhibit 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Tools & Instruments, LLC
Represented By: Rishi Nair
Represented By: Kevin John Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 -2092
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Indonesian Stores (Does 662, 725, 743, 949, 988, 990, 1087, 1088, 1092)
Represented By: Daliah Saper
Represented By: Matthew Richard Grothouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: motorfansclub
Represented By: Larry Ford Banister, II
Represented By: Charles Edward McElvenny
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Paluch-Epton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?