Hunter v. Automated Health Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Evelyn Hunter
Defendant: Automated Health Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02529
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 23, 2019 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Order Number: 35143. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov - 312.435.7626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2019. (Bistany, Nancy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 Amended Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial AMENDED complaint by Evelyn Hunter against Automated Health Systems, Inc. (Fish, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 5/23/2019. Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 6/24/2019. Defendant's responsive pleading due 7/22/2019. Status hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant Automated Health Systems, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint #14 is withdrawn without prejudice. Mailed notice (cn).
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Corey Thomas Hickman for presentment of motion to dismiss #14 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/23/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Hickman, Corey)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Automated Health Systems, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #14 Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hickman, Corey)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Automated Health Systems, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Hickman, Corey)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint #7 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due by 5/13/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 Re- NOTICE of Motion by Corey Thomas Hickman for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/25/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Hickman, Corey)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Evelyn Hunter by John C Kunze (Kunze, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Evelyn Hunter by Kimberly A. Hilton (Hilton, Kimberly)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Evelyn Hunter by David J. Fish (Fish, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Jenny R. Goltz for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/23/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Goltz, Jenny)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Automated Health Systems, Inc. for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint (Goltz, Jenny)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Automated Health Systems, Inc. (Goltz, Jenny)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
April 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Automated Health Systems, Inc. by Corey Thomas Hickman (Hickman, Corey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Circiuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2019CH02784) filed by Automated Health Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Goltz, Jenny) (Receipt number: 0752-15717438) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 4/15/2019 (bg, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Automated Health Systems, Inc. by Jenny R. Goltz (Goltz, Jenny)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Goltz, Jenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Automated Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Hunter
Represented By: John C Kunze
Represented By: David J. Fish
Represented By: Kimberly A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automated Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Represented By: Jenny R. Goltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?