Mark C. Junge v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Plaintiff: Mark C. Junge, Trustee of the Marilyn Junge Living Trust and Mark C Junge
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv02532
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead is granted to and including 7/22/2019. Status hearing set for 7/11/2019 is reset to 7/25/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Notice of motion date of 7/9/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 THIRD UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Molly E. Thompson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #16 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/9/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Thompson, Molly)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 THIRD UNOPPOSED (Thompson, Molly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 6/19/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for extension of time to answer #12 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED SECOND NOTICE of Motion by Molly E. Thompson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/13/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Thompson, Molly)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 UNOPPOSED SECOND (Thompson, Molly)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association by Harry N. Arger (Arger, Harry)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Initial status hearing set for 5/29/2019 is stricken and reset to 6/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report is due 5/18/2019. Notice of motion date of 5/21/2019 is stricken and no appearance are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Molly E. Thompson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/21/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Thompson, Molly)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 UNOPPOSED (Thompson, Molly)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association by Molly E. Thompson (Thompson, Molly)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark C Junge as to Federal National Mortgage Association on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Rickelman, Paul)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 5/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association (mc, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
April 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark C. Junge, Trustee of the Marilyn Junge Living Trust by Paul Maurice Rickelman (Rickelman, Paul)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rickelman, Paul)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark C. Junge, Trustee of the Marilyn Junge Living Trust; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15717676. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit a, #2 Exhibit exhibit b, #3 Exhibit exhibit c, #4 Exhibit exhibit d, #5 Exhibit exhibit e)(Rickelman, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark C. Junge v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Harry N. Arger
Represented By: Molly E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark C. Junge, Trustee of the Marilyn Junge Living Trust
Represented By: Paul Maurice Rickelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark C Junge
Represented By: Paul Maurice Rickelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?