Lira v. Superintendant Walsh et al

Plaintiff: Enrique Lira
Defendant: Cook County Department of Corrections, Tom Dart, Superintendant Walsh, WestBrook, Aguila, Ogrodonik and Erney
Case Number: 1:2019cv02559
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 SUMMONS Issued, certified copy of order dated 6/28/2019 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendants Aguila, Erney, Ogrodonik, WestBrook via email (mc, )
July 1, 2019 MAILED four blank USM-285 service forms and the order dated 6/28/2019 to Plaintiff Enrique Lira (mc, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED complaint by Enrique Lira and no copies. (Envelope postmarked 6/5/2019)(mc, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER : Plaintiff may proceed on his amended complaint. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) file Plaintiff's amended complaint #10 ; (2) add Correctional Officer Westbrook, Correctional Officer Aguila, Correctional Officer Ogrodonik, and Nurse Erney as Defendants; (3) issue summonses for service on these new Defendants; and (4) mail Plaintiff four blank USM-285 service forms. The Court appoints the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendants Westbrook, Aguila, Ogrodonik, and Erney. The Court advises Plaintiff that a completed USM-285 form is required for service on Defendants. Plaintiff must fill out and return the required service forms as to each Defendant or his case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The U.S. Marshal will not attempt service on Defendants unless and until the required forms are received. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/28/2019. Mailed notice (mc, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Superintendant Walsh by Kevin A Thomas (Thomas, Kevin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and no copies by Enrique Lira. (Envelope postmarked 6/5/2019) (ph, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Marshal Service. Superintendant Walsh waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (ph, )
May 14, 2019 MAILED a blank USM-285 service form, copy of the order #5 dated 5/14/2019, a magistrate judge consent form, and filing instructions to Enrique Lira. (mma, )
May 14, 2019 EMAILED Copy of the order #5 dated 5/14/2019 to Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at Cook County Jail. (mma, )
May 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued, certified copy of order dated 5/14/2019 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendant Superintendant Walsh. (mma, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Enrique Lira. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 4/11/19) (mma, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court authorizes and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $23.96 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. Plaintiff's trust fund officer must collect 40% of all income into Plaintiff's trust account until accrued filing fees are paid. The Court summarily dismisses Sheriff Thomas Dart and the Cook County Department of Corrections as Defendants on initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) send a copy of this order to the trust account office at Plaintiff's place of confinement; (2) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (3) issue summons for service on Defendant Walsh; and (4) mail Plaintiff a blank USM-285 service form, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. The Court appoints the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendant Walsh. The Court advises Plaintiff that a completed USM-285 form is required for service on Defendant. Plaintiff must fill out and return the required service form or his case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The U.S. Marshal will not attempt service on Defendant unless and until the required form is received. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/14/2019. Mailed notice. (mma, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Enrique Lira for attorney representation. (kp, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Enrique Lira for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (kp, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (kp, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Enrique Lira (Exhibits). (Attachments: #1 (Envelope postmarked 4/11/19) (kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lira v. Superintendant Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendant Walsh
Represented By: Kevin A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestBrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aguila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogrodonik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?