Montano v. Obaisi

Plaintiff: Aurelio Montano
Defendant: Latoya Williams, Saleh Obaisi and Ghaliah Obaisi
Case Number: 1:2019cv02564
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT filed by Aurelio Montano; Jury Demand (Exhibits). (sxb, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and for the reasons set forth in the Statement below, the Court accepts Plaintiff's complaint for filing as set forth in this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to: (1) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (2) substitute Ghaliah Obaisi, as Independent Executor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi, for Dr. Obaisi as a Defendant in this matter; and (3) terminate the remaining Defendants. Summons shall not issue at this time, however. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 . Richard Patrick McArdle, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, 233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000, Chicago IL 60606, rmcardle@seyfarth.com, is recruited to represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar obligations under N.D. Ill. Local Rules 83.11(h) and 83.37. Counsel is encouraged to visit the Pro Bono Resources for Trial Bar Attorneys now available on the Court's homepage for various resources related to pro bono representation. A status hearing is scheduled for August 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. By that time, counsel is requested to have filed an appearance and conferred with the Plaintiff. Recruited counsel falls within the class of users listed in the Electronic Public Access fee schedule adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States, therefore, counsel shall be exempt from the payment of fees for access via PACER to the electronic case files maintained in this court for the above-captioned case and the previous cases filed in this court by this plaintiff (07 C 1245, 13 C 6087, 14 C 2416, 15 C 3681) only. Counsel is directed to open a separate PACER account for use in this case only. Fees are exempt for this case and the previously identified cases filed in this court by this plaintiff only; counsel shall not be exempt from the payment of fees incurred in connection with other uses of the PACER system in this court. This exemption is valid immediately and for the duration of counsel's participation in this matter. This exemption may be revoked at the discretion of the Court at any time. Counsel shall contact the PACER Service Center at 1-800-676 6856 or via the link below to create the new PACER account and to make any necessary arrangements for the waiver. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff, attorney McArdle, the Systems Department of the Northern District of Illinois, and the PACER Service Center at http://www.pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/register.html. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/21/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT and 1 copy by Aurelio Montano ;(Attachments). (Envelope postmark 4/12/19). (mc, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied for lack of a sufficient showing of indigence. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must, by June 14, 2019, pre-pay the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this matter. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #1 pending payment of the filing fee. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 5/13/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Aurelio Montano for attorney representation; (Attachment). (smm, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Aurelio Montano for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Aurelio Montano (Attachments: #1 Envelope); (Attachments). (Envelope postmark 4/12/19). (smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montano v. Obaisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio Montano
Represented By: Richard Patrick McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saleh Obaisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghaliah Obaisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?