Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Gilardo Jimenez et al
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal and Gilardo Jimenez
Case Number: 1:2019cv02571
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Motion hearing held on 6/28/2019. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and, alternatively, to transfer #13 is due on or before 7/29/2019. Defendants' reply is due on or before 8/12/2019. A status hearing is set for 8/30/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #13 DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND, ALTERNATIVELY, TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal)(Davis, Danita)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Danita Lea Davis for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #13 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Danita)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal Defendants, Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal d/b/a Kora Trucking (erroneously sued as Kora Transport) Motion to Dismiss and, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, MOTION by Defendant Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Davis, Danita)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 5/23/2019:Mailed notice.(gcy, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 8/19/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time #8 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, May 24, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Danita Lea Davis for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Danita)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal for extension of time Defendants Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiffs Complaint (Davis, Danita)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal by Danita Lea Davis And Attorney Appearance for Kora Transport (Davis, Danita)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC as to Gilardo Jimenez on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Steiner, Joel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC as to Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Steiner, Joel)
April 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Gilardo Jimenez, Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal (mc, )
April 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Paul Anthony Gajewski (Gajewski, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Joel H. Steiner (Steiner, Joel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steiner, Joel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Coyote Logistics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15723742.(Steiner, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Gilardo Jimenez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Alberto Jaimes-Bernal
Represented By: Danita Lea Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilardo Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Gajewski
Represented By: Joel H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?