Landmark Technology A, LLC v. Woodland Foods, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A, LLC
Defendant: Woodland Foods, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02577
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Agreed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 6/13/2019. Motion hearing set for 5/16/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Woodland Foods, Ltd. by David Howard Bluestone (Bluestone, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by David Howard Bluestone for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Bluestone, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Woodland Foods, Ltd. for extension of time to file answer (AGREED) (Bluestone, David)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney John Lee's Motion to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15792692. (Lee, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Woodland Foods, Ltd. (mc, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (yap, )
April 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Landmark Technology A, LLC by Isaac Philip Rabicoff (Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Landmark Technology A, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15724348. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology A, LLC v. Woodland Foods, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A, LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodland Foods, Ltd.
Represented By: David Howard Bluestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?