Gordon v. Neiman et al
Plaintiff: Burton L. Gordon
Defendant: Janice K. Neiman and Kenneth M. Neiman
Case Number: 1:2019cv02657
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by Janice K. Neiman, Kenneth M. Neiman to memorandum in opposition to motion #12 to enforce settlement (Goodman, Adam)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Burton L. Gordon in Opposition to motion to enforce #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Andalman, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On May 14, 2019, Defendants filed a motion to enforce settlement #9 . Plaintiff shall submit a response in twenty-one days. Defendants shall submit a reply to Plaintiff's response within fourteen days after it is submitted. The response and reply shall include a proposed list of witnesses to call in the event that an evidentiary hearing is required, along with proposed dates for the hearing. No appearance required on May 24, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 5/15/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Adam B Goodman for presentment of motion to enforce #9 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Goodman, Adam)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Janice K. Neiman, Kenneth M. Neiman to enforce settlement (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 3.2 Statement)(Goodman, Adam)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janice K. Neiman, Kenneth M. Neiman by Adam B Goodman (Goodman, Adam)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Burton L. Gordon as to Janice K. Neiman on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Andalman, Robert)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Burton L. Gordon as to Kenneth M. Neiman on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Andalman, Robert)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Burton L. Gordon by Robert Isidore Berger (Berger, Robert)
April 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Janice K. Neiman, Kenneth M. Neiman, Kenneth M. Neiman, as Trustee of The Saundra G. Neiman Irrevocable Trust I (mc, )
April 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Burton L. Gordon by Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn (Blackburn, Rachael)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Burton L. Gordon by Robert M. Andalman (Andalman, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Andalman, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Burton L. Gordon; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15738446.(Andalman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Neiman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burton L. Gordon
Represented By: Robert Isidore Berger
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K. Neiman
Represented By: Adam B Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Neiman
Represented By: Adam B Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?