Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, Eric Nelson, Weinreis Brothers Partnership, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus and Charles Weinreis
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated, National Beef Packing Company, LLC, JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, John Does 1-10, Marfrig Global Foods S.A., JBS S.A., Swift Beef Company, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Tyson Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02726
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon receipt of the plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), all scheduled hearings and deadlines are stricken and any pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (air, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Eric Nelson, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Charles Weinreis, Weinreis Brothers Partnership (Barile, Peter)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. by Christopher K Veatch (Veatch, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15799054. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Susan Foster (Foster, Susan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15796534. (Jacobs, Jon)
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney Anjali Bhat's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Counsel is directed to file her appearance on behalf of plaintiffs. Mailed notice (air, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15761514. (Bhat, Anjali)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Eric Nelson, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Charles Weinreis, Weinreis Brothers Partnership by David R. Scott (Scott, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:avid R. Scott's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #6 is granted. Mailed notice (air, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Eric Nelson, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Charles Weinreis, Weinreis Brothers Partnership by Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek (Tourek, Christopher)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Eric Nelson, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Charles Weinreis, Weinreis Brothers Partnership by Brian P O'Connell (O'Connell, Brian)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Eric Nelson, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Charles Weinreis, Weinreis Brothers Partnership by Anthony F. Fata (Fata, Anthony)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15752857. (Scott, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jjr, )
April 23, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Incorporated, JBS Packerland, Inc., JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, Marfrig Global Foods S.A., National Beef Packing Company, LLC, Swift Beef Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (mc, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Eric Nelson, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Charles Weinreis, Weinreis Brothers Partnership by Peter Anthony Barile, III (Barile, Peter)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Eric Nelson, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Charles Weinreis, Weinreis Brothers Partnership by Beth A. Kaswan (Kaswan, Beth)
April 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kaswan, Beth)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust, Weinreis Brothers Partnership, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus, Minatare Feedlot, Inc., Charles Weinreis, Eric Nelson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15745959.(Kaswan, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Brian P O'Connell
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Anjali Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minatare Feedlot, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Brian P O'Connell
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Anjali Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Chambers as trustee of the Richard C. Chambers Living Trust
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Brian P O'Connell
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Anjali Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Nelson
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Brian P O'Connell
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Anjali Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weinreis Brothers Partnership
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Brian P O'Connell
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Anjali Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jensen d/b/a Lucky 7 Angus
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Brian P O'Connell
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Anjali Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Weinreis
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Fata
Represented By: Brian P O'Connell
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Beth A. Kaswan
Represented By: Anjali Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS Packerland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marfrig Global Foods S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Beef Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher K Veatch
Represented By: Jon B. Jacobs
Represented By: Susan E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher K Veatch
Represented By: Jon B. Jacobs
Represented By: Susan E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?