Osundairo et al v. Geragos et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Abimbola Osundairo and Olabinjo Osundairo
Defendant: Tina Glandian, Mark Geragos and Geragos & Geragos Law Firm
Case Number: 1:2019cv02727
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk5, Docket)
July 1, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY by Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian to response in opposition to motion,, #63 , MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for reconsideration regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,, order on motion for sanctions,, memorandum opinion and order, #45 #53 (Healey, Brendan)
June 22, 2020 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Tina Glandian's unopposed motion to stay amended complaint response deadline pending resolution of Defendants' motion to reconsider #65 is granted. The obligation to respond to the Amended Complaint is stayed until this Court rules on the Motion to Reconsider and that, once this Court rules on the Motion to Reconsider, this Court will set a schedule for Ms. Glandian to answer or otherwise plead in the response to the Amended Complaint. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION by Defendant Tina Glandian to stay (Healey, Brendan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 64 First AMENDED complaint by Olabinjo Osundairo against All Defendants Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing NoF and CoS)(Kulis, Gregory)
June 10, 2020 Filing 63 RESPONSE by Olabinjo Osundairoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for reconsideration regarding motion for reconsideration #53 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration #54 , MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for reconsideration regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,, order on motion for sanctions,, memorandum opinion and order, #45 #53 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing NoF and CoS)(Kulis, Gregory)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket6, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of Third Amended General Order 20-0012, status hearing set for 5/13/20 is stricken. Briefing schedule set on Defendants' motion to reconsider is modified as follows: response due 6/10/20; reply due 7/1/20. The Court will rule by mail.These dates will not be impacted by any further General Orders regarding COVID 19 absent a motion from the parties. A further status will be set after ruling is issued on the motion. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 59 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo by Gianna Gizzi (Gizzi, Gianna)
April 15, 2020 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: (Recreation of 57 due to system error.) The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to reconsider ruling, motion to dismiss, and ruling on special motion to strike 53 : response due 5/13/20; reply due 6/3/20. The Court will rule by mail. No appearance necessary on 5/12/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to reconsider ruling, motion to dismiss, and ruling on special motion to strike #53 : response due 5/13/20; reply due 6/3/20. The Court will rule by mail. No appearance necessary on 5/12/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM motion for reconsideration #53 by Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian Correction of Docket No. 54 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Healey, Brendan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Healey for presentment of motion for reconsideration #53 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 5/12/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Healey, Brendan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for reconsideration regarding motion for reconsideration #53 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Healey, Brendan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for reconsideration regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,, order on motion for sanctions,, memorandum opinion and order, #45 (Healey, Brendan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motions to withdraw as counsel #48 and #49 are granted. No appearance necessary on 4/7/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #49 , motion to withdraw as attorney #48 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 4/7/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Kulis, Gregory)
March 30, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION by Attorney Brian Orozco to withdraw as attorney for Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.. No party information provided (Orozco, Brian)
March 30, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION by Attorney Monica Ghosh to withdraw as attorney for Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.. No party information provided (Ghosh, Monica)
March 17, 2020 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Status hearing set for 5/13/2020 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint #23 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' motion for Rule 11 sanctions #27 is denied. See opinion and order for details. Plaintiffs have 30 days to amend their complaint consistent with the Court's opinion. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/17/2020. Mailed notice.(dm, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of the pending motion and the reassignment status report, the court strikes the reassignment status set for 9/25/19. The court will set a status following a ruling on the pending motions. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 43 STATUS Report for Reassigned Case by Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian (Healey, Brendan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian to motion for miscellaneous relief #23 Reply Memorandum in Support of the Defendants Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal Civ. Proc. Code 425.16 (Healey, Brendan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Reassignment status hearing set for 9/25/19 at 1:30pm in courtroom 1225. Parties are directed to review Judge Rowland's Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland, on the Court's website at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. On or before 9/18/19, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. The report shall provide the information listed in the "Initial Status Report for Reassigned Case," a link to which is provided in the Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to extend dates for Plaintiffs' response to defendants' motion to dismiss #34 is granted. Plaintiffs' response is due 8/23/19; defendants' reply is due 9/9/19. No appearance necessary on 8/29/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 39 RE- NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #34 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 8/29/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Kulis, Gregory)
August 26, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion hearing before Judge Kennelly on 8/27/2019 is vacated because the case has been reassigned to Judge Rowland. (mk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian DEFENDANTS RULE 12(b)(2) AND RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16 #23 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kulis, Gregory)
August 22, 2019 Filing 36 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9,2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(rp, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Gregory E. Kulis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #34 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kulis, Gregory)
August 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for miscellaneous relief #23 UNOPPOSED (Kulis, Gregory)
August 6, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Brendan J. Healey of Change of Address (Healey, Brendan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Healey, Brendan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Healey, Brendan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 7/23/2019. Motion for leave to file excess pages #25 is granted; motion for sanctions #27 is tabled. Response to motion to dismiss #23 due by 8/20/2019; reply due by 9/4/2019. The 7/30/2019 hearing date is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Healey for presentment of motion for sanctions #27 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Healey, Brendan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian in support of motion for sanctions #27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Healey, Brendan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for sanctions Under Rule 11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Healey, Brendan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Healey for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #25 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Healey, Brendan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Memorandum and Exhibits)(Healey, Brendan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Healey for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #23 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Healey, Brendan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian DEFENDANTS RULE 12(b)(2) AND RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16 (Healey, Brendan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 6/20/2019 with attorneys for both sides. Status hearing is set for 7/23/2019 at 9:29 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Agreed motion for extension of time #18 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 7/19/2019. The case remains set for an initial status hearing on 6/20/2019 as ordered, and counsel are to be fully prepared to proceed with the status hearing at that time. (mk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian by Natalie Anne Harris (Harris, Natalie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Healey for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Healey, Brendan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian for extension of time AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Healey, Brendan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.. Geragos & Geragos Law Firm waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Tunick, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.. Tina Glandian waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Tunick, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd.. Mark Geragos waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Tunick, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 5/30/2019. Motion for order #7 is terminated as moot. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark Geragos, Geragos & Geragos Law Firm, Tina Glandian by Brendan J. Healey (Healey, Brendan)
May 26, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Order of 5/24/2019 is corrected to state that the initial status hearing is set for 9:00 AM on 6/20/2019. (mk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on /620/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo by Jorge Antonio Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Jorge)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo by Gloria Virginia Schmidt (Schmidt, Gloria)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by James D. Tunick for presentment of motion for order #7 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Tunick, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo for order that Service of Summons be Made by a United States Marshal or Deputy Marshal, pursuant to FRCP 4(c)(3) (Tunick, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo by James D. Tunick (Tunick, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo by Monica Ghosh (Ghosh, Monica)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo by Brian M Orozco (Orozco, Brian)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Lien by Gregory E. Kulis & Associates, Ltd. (Kulis, Gregory)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abimbola Osundairo, Olabinjo Osundairo by Gregory E. Kulis (Kulis, Gregory)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Olabinjo Osundairo, Abimbola Osundairo; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15746203. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kulis, Gregory)
April 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osundairo et al v. Geragos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abimbola Osundairo
Represented By: James D. Tunick
Represented By: Gregory E. Kulis
Represented By: Monica Ghosh
Represented By: Brian M Orozco
Represented By: Gloria Virginia Schmidt
Represented By: Jorge Antonio Rodriguez
Represented By: Gianna Gizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olabinjo Osundairo
Represented By: James D. Tunick
Represented By: Gregory E. Kulis
Represented By: Monica Ghosh
Represented By: Brian M Orozco
Represented By: Gloria Virginia Schmidt
Represented By: Jorge Antonio Rodriguez
Represented By: Gianna Gizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Glandian
Represented By: Natalie Anne Harris
Represented By: Brendan J. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Geragos
Represented By: Natalie Anne Harris
Represented By: Brendan J. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geragos & Geragos Law Firm
Represented By: Natalie Anne Harris
Represented By: Brendan J. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?